EP1301306 - CUTTING TOOL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL | [2006/37] |
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states New Iscar Ltd. P.O. Box 11 24959 Tefen / IL | ||
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states ISCAR LTD. P.O. Box 11 Tefen 24959 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARPAZ, Jacob 5 Hiram Street 25147 Kfar Vradim / IL | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/16] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01940957.2 | 06.06.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001IL00519 | Priority number, date | IL20000137316 | 16.07.2000 Original published format: IL 13731600 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0205996 | Date: | 24.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1301306 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1301306 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10, B23B31/11 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
B23B31/11 (EP,US);
B23C5/10 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2210/02 (EP,US);
B23C2210/03 (EP,US);
Y10T407/19 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1906 (EP,US);
Y10T408/90993 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDWERKZEUGZUSAMMENBAU | [2003/16] | English: | CUTTING TOOL ASSEMBLY | [2003/16] | French: | ENSEMBLE OUTIL DE COUPE | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 18.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 16.07.2008 | CY | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | [2014/24] |
Former [2011/44] | BE | 16.07.2008 | |
CY | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/47] | BE | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | BE | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5598751 (OCHAYON MOTI [IL], et al); | [A]EP0776719 (SERVICE DE MACHINES ET OUTILLA [FR]) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 49; figure 1 *; | [A]US5899642 (BERGLOEW CARL-ERIK [SE], et al) [A] 1-4,7 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 6; figures 1A,1B *; | [A]US6053670 (SCHMID KONRAD [CH]); | [AP]EP1029620 (NIKKEN KOSAKUSHO WORKS LTD [JP]) [AP] 5,6 * figure 18A * |