EP1205743 - INDICATOR FOR PLASMA STERILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hogy Medical Co., Ltd. 12-4, Yushima 1-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0034 / JP | [2010/07] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states Hogy Medical Co., Ltd. 12-4, Yushima 1-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0034 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikumo, Masao c/o Hogy Medical Co., Ltd. 12-4, Yushima 1-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0034 / JP | 02 /
Kazama, Kenji c/o Hogy Medical Co., Ltd. 12-4, Yushima 1-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0034 / JP | 03 /
Jo, Yoshio c/o Hogy Medical Co., Ltd. 12-4, Yushima 1-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0034 / JP | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Neilson, Martin Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Neilson, Martin Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2004/42] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr., et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2002/20] | Wharton, Peter Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01941057.0 | 15.06.2001 | [2002/20] | WO2001JP05104 | Priority number, date | JP20000197166 | 29.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000197166 | [2002/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0201205 | Date: | 03.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205743 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1205743 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/28, G01N21/78, G01N31/22, C09B11/24, C09B11/28 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
G01N21/78 (EP,US);
A61L2/28 (EP,US);
G01N31/226 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/20] | G01N21/78, G01N31/22, A61L2/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/07] |
Former [2002/20] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | INDIKATOR FÜR DIE PLASMASTERILISATION | [2002/20] | English: | INDICATOR FOR PLASMA STERILIZATION | [2002/20] | French: | INDICATEUR POUR STERILISATION AU PLASMA | [2002/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2001 | Translation filed | 14.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4740383 (MITA FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * example 1; claims 1,4,5,10 *; | [A]US5340537 (BARRETT RICHARD B [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 5, line 63 - column 5, line 66; claims 1,6 *; | [A]WO9846994 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-5* page 4, line 13 - page 4, line 32; claims 1,3 * | International search | [X]JPH11178904 (HOGI MEDICAL KK); | [Y]JPH1030986 (ST CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JPH05320616 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) | by applicant | US4169123 | JPH11178904 |