EP1293130 - ACIDIC MILKY DRINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calpis Co., Ltd. 20-3, Ebisu-Nishi 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0021 / JP | [2006/43] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Calpis Co., Ltd. 20-3, Ebisu-Nishi 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOMOTO, Akishige C520, 1716-1, Bukkou-cho Yodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 240-0044 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Kentaro Uirl Minaminaruse A-201 2-3-2, Minaminaruse Machida-shi Tokyo 194-0045 / JP | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01941066.1 | 15.06.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001JP05118 | Priority number, date | JP20000184322 | 20.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000184322 | [2003/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0197624 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293130 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1293130 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/152, A23C9/13, A23L2/52, A23C9/12, A23L2/42 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
A23C9/13 (EP,KR,US);
A23C9/1565 (EP,US);
A23L2/02 (EP,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/12] | A23C9/152, A23C9/13, A23L2/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAURES MILCHGETRAENK | [2003/12] | English: | ACIDIC MILKY DRINK | [2003/12] | French: | BOISSON ACIDE A BASE DE LAIT | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2003 | Translation filed | 03.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 03.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 20.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2006 | BE | 25.10.2006 | CH | 25.10.2006 | CY | 25.10.2006 | FI | 25.10.2006 | LI | 25.10.2006 | NL | 25.10.2006 | TR | 25.10.2006 | DK | 25.01.2007 | SE | 25.01.2007 | GR | 26.01.2007 | ES | 05.02.2007 | PT | 26.03.2007 | IE | 15.06.2007 | LU | 15.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 25.10.2006 | |
BE | 25.10.2006 | ||
CH | 25.10.2006 | ||
CY | 25.10.2006 | ||
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
LI | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
IE | 15.06.2007 | ||
LU | 15.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 25.10.2006 | |
BE | 25.10.2006 | ||
CH | 25.10.2006 | ||
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
LI | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
IE | 15.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 25.10.2006 | |
BE | 25.10.2006 | ||
CH | 25.10.2006 | ||
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
LI | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
GR | 26.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 25.10.2006 | |
BE | 25.10.2006 | ||
CH | 25.10.2006 | ||
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
LI | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 25.10.2006 | |
BE | 25.10.2006 | ||
CH | 25.10.2006 | ||
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
LI | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 25.10.2006 | |
BE | 25.10.2006 | ||
CH | 25.10.2006 | ||
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
LI | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
DK | 25.01.2007 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 25.10.2006 | |
BE | 25.10.2006 | ||
CH | 25.10.2006 | ||
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
IT | 25.10.2006 | ||
LI | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 25.10.2006 | |
BE | 25.10.2006 | ||
CH | 25.10.2006 | ||
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
LI | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 25.10.2006 | |
FI | 25.10.2006 | ||
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
PT | 26.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 25.10.2006 | |
NL | 25.10.2006 | ||
SE | 25.01.2007 | ||
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 25.10.2006 | |
ES | 05.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 25.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH0823939 ; | [A]JPH09266767 ; | [AP]JP2001157547 ; | [A]US5026833 (SUZUKI YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] * columns 1-2 *; | [AD] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 14, Database accession no. 1996-133383, XP002322671 & JPH0823939 A 19960130 (SANEIGEN FFI KK) [AD] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 01, Database accession no. 1998-002833, XP002322672 & JPH09266767 A 19971014 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA LTD) [A] * abstract * | [AP] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 49, Database accession no. 2001-454219, XP002322673 & JP2001157547 A 20010612 (YAKULT HONSHA KK) [AP] * abstract * | [AP] - GIL M I ET AL, "Antioxidant activity of pomegranate juice and its relationship with phenolic composition and processing", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (20000915), vol. 48, no. 10, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 4581 - 4589, XP002251851 [AP] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf000404a | International search | [A]JPS6384446 (TOHO BUSSAN KAISHA); | [A]JPH05304887 (MEIJI MILK PROD CO LTD); | [A]JPH119189 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC) |