EP1219975 - CORPUSCULAR BEAM IMAGE DETECTOR USING GAS AMPLIFICATION BY PIXEL TYPE ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | ||
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | ||
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8-, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | ||
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIMORI, Toru 1-407, Kitashirakawa Yamadacho, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8272 / JP | 02 /
OCHI, Atsuhiko 2-14-101, Akasakadori 6-chome, Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 657-0821 / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/27] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01941078.6 | 18.06.2001 | [2002/27] | WO2001JP05165 | Priority number, date | JP20000191994 | 27.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000191994 | [2002/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0201249 | Date: | 03.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1219975 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1219975 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/18, G01T1/185 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
G01T1/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | KOPRUSKULARSTRAHLBILDDETEKTOR MIT HILFE VON GASVERSTÄRKUNG UND BILDELEKTRODEN | [2002/27] | English: | CORPUSCULAR BEAM IMAGE DETECTOR USING GAS AMPLIFICATION BY PIXEL TYPE ELECTRODES | [2002/27] | French: | DETECTEUR D'IMAGES A FAISCEAU CORPUSCULAIRE A AMPLIFICATION GAZEUSE PAR ELECTRODES PONCTUELLES | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2002 | Translation filed | 04.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6046454 (LINGREN CLINTON L [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 25, line 5 - column 26, line 41 ** figure 17 *; | [A] - TANIMORI T ET AL, "Imaging gaseous detector based on micro-processing technology", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19991021), vol. 436, no. 1-2, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 188 - 195, XP004182095 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9002(99)00619-1 | [A] - CAPEANS M ET AL, "The virtual cathode chamber", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19971121), vol. 400, no. 1, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 17 - 23, XP004099658 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9002(97)00947-9 | International search | [A]JPH09508750 ; | [A]JPH10300856 (KAGAKU GIJUTSU SHINKO JIGYODAN) |