EP1289373 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STUNNING AND KILLING AQUATIC ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEDERLANDS INSTITUUT VOOR VISSERIJONDERZOEK (RIVO) Haringkade 1 1976 CP Ijmuiden / NL | [2004/17] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states NEDERLANDS INSTITUUT VOOR ZUIVELONDERZOEK (RIVO) Haringkade 1 1976 CP Ijmuiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBB, David, Henry, Francis 6 Kensington Place Clifton Bristol BS8 3AH / GB | 02 /
KESTIN, Steven Charles Mead Cottage, Stock Lane Langford, Bristol North BS40 5EU / GB | 03 /
TEJADA YABAR, Margarita Avenida Valladolid, 47 F E-28008 Madrid / ES | 04 /
HUIDOBRO PEREZ-VILLAMIL, Almudena Pedro Muguruza, 8, 6-A E-28036 Madrid / ES | 05 /
KUHLMANN, Holmer Fasanenstieg 12 22397 Hamburg / DE | 06 /
NESVADBA, Paul 15 Angusfield Avenue Aberdeen AB15 6AR / GB | 07 /
SORENSEN, Nils, Kristian Paul Figenschauswei 6 N-9009 Tromso / NO | 08 /
KLOOSTERBOER, Rika, Johanna De Raetstraat 31 NL-1951 XZ Velsen-Noord / NL | 09 /
VAN DE VIS, Johannes, Wilhelmus Normandi[ 27 NL-3524 RE Utrecht / NL | 10 /
SCHELVIS-SMIT, Adriana, Anna, Maria J. Paxtenstraat 49 NL-1991 BL Velserbroek / NL | 11 /
OTTERAA, Haakon Sollien 143 b N-5096 Bergen / NO | 12 /
BYRNE, Hazel Joyce Foster Whitestripes Cottage East Grandhome Estate, Aberdeen AB22 8AS / GB | 13 /
AKSE, Leif, Jorgen Varden 82 N-9018 Tromso / NO | 14 /
VANCOILLE, Caroline, Godelieve, Anna, Marie Breedijk 11 NL-5705 CJ Helmond / NL | 15 /
VAN RIJSINGEN, Johannes, Cornelis, Maria Lambert Colenstraat 14 NL-5708 BZ Helmond / NL | 16 /
PIETERSE, Cornelis M. Breuererf 3 NL-3822 VB Amersfoort / NL | 17 /
LAMBOOIJ, Elbert Beukenhof 33 NL-8212 EG Lelystad / NL | 18 /
MUNKNER, Werner Palmaille 29 22767 Hamburg / DE | 19 /
OEHLENSCHLÄGER, Jörg Sandstrasse 11a 21244 Buchholz / DE | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/11] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01941299.8 | 28.05.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001NL00412 | Priority number, date | NL20001015306 | 25.05.2000 Original published format: NL 1015306 | [2003/11] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0195732 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1289373 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1289373 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A22B3/08, A22B3/06 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
A22B3/083 (EP);
A22B3/005 (EP);
A22B3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETÄUBEN UND SCHLACHTEN VON WASSERTIEREN | [2003/11] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STUNNING AND KILLING AQUATIC ANIMALS | [2003/11] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ASSOMMER ET TUER DES ANIMAUX AQUATIQUES | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2001 | Translation filed | 23.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 02.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0561470 (STORK RMS BV [NL]) [A] 1 * claims 1-15 *; | [X]DE29811877U (ATMOS ANLAGEN UND VERFAHRENSTE [DE]) [X] 1,11 * page 1, lines 12-27; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A] - MARX H ET AL, "METHODS OF STUNNING FRESHWATER FISH: IMPACT ON MEAT QUALITY AND ASPECTS OF ANIMAL WELFARE", ZEITSCHRIFT FUER LEBENSMITTEL-UNTERSUCHUNG UND -FORSCHUNG. A, EUROPEAN FOOD RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY,DE,SPRINGER, HEIDELBERG, (1997), vol. 204, no. 4, ISSN 1431-4630, pages 282 - 286, XP000884022 [A] 1-4 * page 282, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002170050078 |