EP1302003 - A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR REDUCING SIGNALLING TRAFFIC IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDSTRÖM, Anders Granlidsvägen 48 S-653 51 Karlstad / SE | 02 /
SHIN, Boo Uddbyvägen 13 S-135 55 Tyresö / SE | 03 /
NILSSON, Bertil Taggsvampsvägen 181 S-141 60 Huddinge / SE | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Holmberg-Schwindt, Tor Martin, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Holmberg, Martin Tor, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/16] | Rosenquist, Per Olof, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB, P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01941400.2 | 15.06.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001SE01366 | Priority number, date | SE20000002290 | 19.06.2000 Original published format: SE 0002290 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0199309 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1302003 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
H04B7/18508 (EP,US);
H04B7/18545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON ZEICHENGABEVERKEHR IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2003/16] | English: | A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR REDUCING SIGNALLING TRAFFIC IN A TELECOMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2003/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LE TRAFIC SEMAPHORE DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATION | [2003/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 07.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5950129 (SCHMID GLEN [CA], et al); | [XE]WO0115337 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al); | [XE]WO0115466 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al); | [AE]GB2350972 (MARCONI ELECTRONIC SYST LTD [GB]); | [A]WO9944309 (ERICSSON INC [US]); | [A]EP0915577 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]); | [A]EP0998062 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) | Examination | WO9602094 | EP0828354 | US5956639 |