EP1290747 - FUEL CELLS AND FUEL CELL SYSTEMS CONTAINING NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IdaTech, LLC. P.O. Box 5339 Bend Oregon 97708-5339 / US | [2009/08] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states IdaTech, LLC. P.O. Box 5339 Bend, Oregon 97708-5339 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDLUND, David, J. 1698 Davenport Bend, OR 97701 / US | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01941870.6 | 01.06.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001US18002 | Priority number, date | US20000208880P | 01.06.2000 Original published format: US 208880 P | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0193362 | Date: | 06.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1290747 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1290747 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/14, H01M8/22, H01M8/08, H01M8/04, C01B3/32, C01B3/26, // H01M8/06 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
C01B3/38 (EP,US);
C01B3/323 (EP,US);
C01B3/501 (EP,US);
C01B3/56 (EP,US);
H01M8/0289 (EP,US);
H01M8/0293 (EP,US);
H01M8/1016 (EP,US);
H01M8/144 (EP,US);
H01M8/22 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0261 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0405 (EP,US);
C01B2203/041 (EP,US);
C01B2203/043 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0445 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0465 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,US);
C01B2203/048 (EP,US);
C01B2203/142 (EP,US);
C01B2203/146 (EP,US);
H01M2300/002 (EP,US);
H01M8/0612 (EP,US);
H01M8/143 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | H01M8/14, H01M8/08, H01M8/00, H01M8/04, H01M4/86, H01M4/00, C10J3/68, B01J7/00, B01J8/02, C01B3/32, C01B3/26, C01B3/12, C01B3/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLEN UND BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEME MIT NICHTWÄSSRIGEN ELEKTROLYTEN | [2003/11] | English: | FUEL CELLS AND FUEL CELL SYSTEMS CONTAINING NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTES | [2003/11] | French: | PILES A COMBUSTIBLE ET SYSTEMES DE PILES A COMBUSTIBLE CONTENANT DES ELECTROLYTES NON AQUEUX | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 23.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.02.2009 | BE | 18.02.2009 | CY | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | IT | 18.02.2009 | NL | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | ES | 29.05.2009 | IE | 01.06.2009 | LU | 01.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IE | 01.06.2009 | ||
LU | 01.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IE | 01.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IE | 01.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IE | 01.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 18.02.2009 | |
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 18.02.2009 | |
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | ES | 29.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3419900 (ELMORE GLENN V, et al) [X] 1,4,12,13,15-20 * Col. 1, lines 16-26; Col. 2, line 30 - Col. 3, line 10; Col. 3, line 54 - Col. 4, line 6; Fig. 1-2; Claims 1, 2 & 4 *; | [A]DE1903522 (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V) [A] 1-31* P. 1, lines 1-3; P. 4, line 5 - P. 5, line 4; Examples; Claim 1 *; | [A]GB2095025 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-31 * P. 1, lines 3-8, 35-47, 64-71 & 119-122; Fig. 1; Examples; Claim 1 *; | [A]US4612261 (TSUKUI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * Col. 1, lines 6-12; Col. 2, lines 38-56; Fig. 1; Claims 1 & 15 * | International search | [X]US3877989 (WALDMAN ELLIOT ISADORE, et al); | [A]USRE33149E ; | [X]US5599638 (SURAMPUDI SUBBARAO [US], et al); | [X]US5997594 (EDLUND DAVID J [US], et al); | [XP]US6183914 (YAO WAYNE [US], et al) |