Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003187739 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US87668701 | 07.06.2001 | US35474303 | 30.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003536145 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0118442 | 07.06.2001 | US20992300 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7536001 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0118442 | 07.06.2001 | US20992300 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1311999 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2005 | A4 | EP1311999 | 21.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0118442 | 07.06.2001 | US20992300 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0111495 | 25.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0118442 | 07.06.2001 | US20992300 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2411057 | 13.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0118442 | 07.06.2001 | US20992300 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20025853L | 21.01.2003 | L | NO20025853D0 | 05.12.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US0118442 | 07.06.2001 | US20992300 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2001054004 | 20.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US87668701 | 07.06.2001 | US20992300 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0195222 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20992300 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20030023870 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US20992300 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1443336 | 17.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US20992300 | 07.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL358834 | 23.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20992300 | 07.06.2000 |