EP1311999 - METHOD OF DIRECT COMMUNICATION BETWEEN A BUSINESS AND ITS CUSTOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Powers, Arthur P.O. Box 1009 New York, NY 10014 / US | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01942064.5 | 07.06.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001US18442 | Priority number, date | US20000209923P | 07.06.2000 Original published format: US 209923 P | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0195222 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1311999 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q50/00 (KR);
G06Q10/06375 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0239 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0255 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0267 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | 06.01.2003 | LT | 06.01.2003 | LV | 06.01.2003 | MK | 06.01.2003 | RO | 06.01.2003 | SI | 06.01.2003 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIREKTEN KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN EINEM UNTERNEHMEN UND SEINEN KUNDEN | [2003/21] | English: | METHOD OF DIRECT COMMUNICATION BETWEEN A BUSINESS AND ITS CUSTOMERS | [2003/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION DIRECTE ENTRE UNE ENTREPRISE ET SES CLIENTS | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/51] | 25.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.12.2004 | 30.06.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5848396 (GERACE THOMAS A [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 60 * * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 22 *; | [X]US5855008 (GOLDHABER A NATHANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 6, line 50 - line 65 * * column 7, line 28 - line 32 * * column 12, line 21 - line 42 * * column 14, line 46 - line 48 * * column 16 *; | [A]WO9913423 (NARRATIVE COMMUNICATIONS CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 31 *; | [X]WO9952056 (PREVIEW SOFTWARE [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 24 * * page 6, line 1 - line 28 *; | [X] - LINLEY GWENNAP, "Pentium III Serial Number Is Just a Tool", IN-STAT MDR, vol. 13, no. 2, (19990215), URL: http://www.mdronline.com/mpr_public/editorials/edit13_02.html, (20050801), XP002338979 [X] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6055573 (GARDENSWARTZ WILL H [US], et al); | [YE]US6285985 (HORSTMANN CAY [US]) |