EP1250318 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ARYL-IMINOMETHYL-CARBAMIC ACID ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co.KG Binger Strasse 173 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co.KG Binger Strasse 173 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma KG 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDENBURG, Jörg Erasmusstrasse 6 65199 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
SOYKA, Rainer Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 43 88400 Biberach / DE | 03 /
SCHMID, Rolf Talstrasse 27 88487 Baltringen / DE | 04 /
ANDERSKEWITZ, Ralf Edith-Stein-Str. 30 88471 Laupheim / DE | 05 /
BAUER, Rolf Tannenweg 18a 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 06 /
HAMM, Rainer In der Bitz 20 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 07 /
KRÖBER, Jutta Im Tiergarten 23 55411 Bingen / DE | [2002/50] |
Former [2002/43] | 01 /
BRANDENBURG, Jörg Erasmusstrasse 6 65199 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
02 /
SOYKA, Rainer Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 43 88400 Biberach / DE | |||
03 /
SCHMID, Rolf Talstrasse 27 88487 Baltringen / DE | |||
04 /
ANDERSKEWITZ, Ralf Stromberger Strasse 36c 55411 Bingen / DE | |||
05 /
BAUER, Rolf Tannenweg 18a 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
06 /
HAMM, Rainer In der Bitz 20 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
07 /
KRÖBER, Jutta Im Tiergarten 23 55411 Bingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01942357.3 | 11.01.2001 | [2002/43] | WO2001EP00262 | Priority number, date | DE2000100907 | 12.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10000907 | [2002/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0151457 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1250318 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1250318 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C269/00, C07C271/12, C07C255/54 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
C07C271/00 (EP);
C07C269/00 (EP,KR);
C07C271/20 (EP);
C07C271/64 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C269/00, C07C271/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Extension states | LT | 12.08.2002 | LV | 12.08.2002 | RO | 12.08.2002 | SI | 12.08.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ARYL-IMINOMETHYL-CARBAMINSÄUREESTERN | [2002/43] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ARYL-IMINOMETHYL-CARBAMIC ACID ESTERS | [2002/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ESTERS D'ACIDE ARYL-IMINOMETHYL-CARBAMIQUE | [2002/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 25.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | IE | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | TR | 30.11.2005 | BE | 31.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | SE | 28.02.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0518818 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 1 - line 45 ** claim 17 *; | [DA]WO9602497 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-11 * example 4 * * claim 13 * |