12.08.2022 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
25.04.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
09.08.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
17.05.2021 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
08.05.2021 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
08.05.2021 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
10.04.2020 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.09.2019 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.05.2019 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.05.2019 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
18.01.2019 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
15.09.2017 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
30.06.2017 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
27.11.2015 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
30.09.2015 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
28.09.2015 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
28.09.2015 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
21.08.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
14.07.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
14.07.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
04.12.2014 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.12.2013 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
23.07.2013 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
28.06.2013 |
Opposition filed |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
17.08.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
17.08.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
08.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.08.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.05.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.03.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |
28.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
25.07.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.07.2008 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.07.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.07.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
09.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2005 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
28.06.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.02.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.12.2004 |
First examination report |
|
09.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
13.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.03.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
13.02.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.09.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] |
13.09.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] |
09.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|