Designated contracting states | DE | | FR | | GB | Lapse: 18.01.2021 | NL | | Examination procedure | 01.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | | 19.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 19.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | European patent granted | 19.09.2012 | Opposition procedure | 06.05.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent | published on 07.09.2022 | Appeal following opposition | 24.09.2015 | APPEAL FILED | 25.11.2015 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 07.05.2021 | APPEAL RESULT | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 30.10.2002 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR | | Event date: | 30.10.2002 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20020819 | | Event date: | 30.10.2002 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Event date: | 26.05.2004 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB NL | | Event date: | 02.02.2005 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20041221 | | Event date: | 19.09.2012 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MATERIALS INC. | | Event date: | 19.09.2012 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB NL | | Event date: | 19.09.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 15.11.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 60147131 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20121115 | | Event date: | 05.12.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 31.07.2013 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | DOW CORNING CORPORATION | Effective DATE: | 20130619 | | Event date: | 19.09.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R026 60147131 DE | Code Expl.: | -OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20130619 | | Event date: | 23.09.2015 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MATERIALS INC. | | Event date: | 26.01.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Event date: | 25.01.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Event date: | 02.08.2017 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | DOW CORNING CORPORATION | Effective DATE: | 20130619 | | Event date: | 18.10.2017 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | DOW CORNING CORPORATION | Effective DATE: | 20130619 | | Event date: | 25.01.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 20.02.2019 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | DOW SILICONES CORPORATION | Effective DATE: | 20130619 | | Event date: | 01.05.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20200126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.05.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20200127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 01.05.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20200129 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.06.2020 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20200127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 28.09.2015 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO | | Event date: | 27.11.2015 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | | Event date: | 28.09.2015 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Event date: | 30.09.2015 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Event date: | 19.01.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 60147131 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 20.01.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20210118 | | Event date: | 10.02.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20210118 | | Event date: | 17.08.2012 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 08.08.2012 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 18.05.2012 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 29.07.2005 | | Event description: | OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA | | Event date: | 13.09.2002 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 30.04.2021 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20210118 | | Event date: | 08.05.2021 | | Event description: | APPEAL PROCEDURE CLOSED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA9O | | Event date: | 17.08.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Event date: | 28.06.2013 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 18.01.2019 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 15.09.2017 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 30.06.2017 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 03.12.2013 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 23.07.2013 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 25.04.2022 | | Event description: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1 | | Event date: | 25.04.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Event date: | 12.08.2022 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009271 | | Event date: | 12.08.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED | | Event date: | 06.05.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R064 60147131 DE | Code Expl.: | -EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL | | Event date: | 06.05.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R103 60147131 DE | Code Expl.: | -PATENT REVOKED BY EPO | | Event date: | 14.09.2022 | | Event description: | PATENT REVOKED | Effective DATE: | 20220506 | |