EP1252252 - ROOM TEMPERATURE CURABLE SILICONE SEALANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc. 260 Hudson River Road Waterford, NY 12188 / US | [2015/39] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc. 22 Corporate Woods Boulevard Albany, NY 12211 / US | ||
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Chiu-Sing 2187 FoxHill Drive Schenectady, NY 12309 / US | 02 /
ATWOOD, Robert, C. 35 Lake Ridge Drive Mechanicville, NY 12118 / US | 03 /
LUCAS, Gary, M. 21 St. Anthony Lane Glenville, NY 12302 / US | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/44] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr., et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01942656.8 | 19.01.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001US01841 | Priority number, date | US20000176823P | 19.01.2000 Original published format: US 176823 P | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0153425 | Date: | 26.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1252252 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1252252 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/10, C08L83/04 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
C09K3/1018 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/16 (EP,US);
Y10S528/901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L2666/02, C08L2666/54 (US,EP);
C08L83/04, C08L2666/28 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | BEI RAUMTEMPERATUR AUSHÄRTBARE SILIKONDICHTUNGSMASSE | [2002/44] | English: | ROOM TEMPERATURE CURABLE SILICONE SEALANT | [2002/44] | French: | AGENT D'ETANCHEITE A BASE DE SILICONE, DURCISSANT A LA TEMPERATURE AMBIANTE | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2005 | Observations by third parties | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10011312.5 / EP2292714 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2004 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2013
25.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dow Silicones Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, MI 48686-0994 / US Opponent's representative Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2013
25.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dow Silicones Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, MI 48686-0994 / US Opponent's representative Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2017/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2013
25.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road, P.O. Box 994 Midland, MI 48686-0994 / US Opponent's representative Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2017/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2013
25.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road, P.O. Box 994 Midland, MI 48686-0994 / US Opponent's representative Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2013/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.06.2013
25.06.2013
ADMISSIBLE Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road, P.O. Box 994 Midland, MI 48686-0994 / US Opponent's representative Donlan, Andrew Michael Dow corning limited Intellectual Property Departement Cardiff road Barry South Glamorgan CF63 2YL / GB | 24.07.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.11.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.07.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.05.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.05.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/37] | Appeal following opposition | 24.09.2015 | Appeal received No. T1905/15 | 25.11.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.05.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 18.01.2021 | [2021/22] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4144216 (CLARK WILLIAM H, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4164617 (VAN KESTEREN JACOBUS P I [NL]) [A] 1,16* the whole document *; | [X]WO9113945 (INVESTORS DIVERSIFIED CAPITAL [US]) [X] 1,3-13 * page 1, line 8 - line 18 * * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 11 * * page 11, line 1 - page 14, line 5 * * page 15, line 17 - page 16, line 9 * * claims 1,2,11 *; | [X]US5217651 (NAGAOKA HISAYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-13,16-18 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2283185 (DELVEMADE LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,6-14,16-18 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0839870 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [A] 1,12-14 * page 2, line 32 - line 48 * * page 4, line 11 - line 23 * * claim 1 * | Examination | EP0043501 | DE3342027 | DE3342026 | EP0885921 | US5863976 |