EP1291649 - PULSED FIELD ELECTROPHORESIS CHAMBERS, ACCESSORIES AND METHOD OF UTILIZATION FOR SEPARATION OF DNA MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centro Nacional De Investigaciones Cientificas (CNIC) Avenida 25, No. 15202,esq. a 158 Cubanacan, Playa Ciudad de la Habana 12100 / CU | [2009/42] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Centro Nacional De Investigaciones Cientificas (CNIC) Avenida 25, No. 15202,esq. a 158 Cubanacan, Playa Ciudad de la Habana 12100 / CU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIVERON ROJAS, Ana Maria Calle 21 A, No. 20614 entre 206A y 214 Atabey Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | 02 /
LOPEZ CANOVA, Lilia Calle 21A, No. 20614 entre 206A y 214 Atabey Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | 03 /
ARENCIBIA DIAZ, Oscar Calle 174 Edif. BBE-1 Apto. 6 Rto. FLORES Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | 04 /
HERRERA ISIDRON, Jose Alfredo Calle 174 Edif. BBE-2 Apto. 14, Rpto Flores Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | 05 /
PEREZ PEREZ, Gabriel Calle 25, No. 868 Apto. 1, Vedado Plaza de la Revolucion Cuba 10400 / CU | 06 /
OROZCO OROZCO, Esther Via Ceti No. 20 Fracc. Luis Enrique Erro Planetario Lindavista Mexico, D.F. 07000 / MX | 07 /
CANINO RAMOS, Carlos Alberto Clle 192 Calle 192 No.1991 entre 199 y 201 Maria del Carmen Boyeros Ciudad de Habana 19200 / CU | 08 /
BATISTA SANTILER, Luis Mariano Ave 31, No. 31206 entre 312 y 316 Juan de Dios Fraga Ciud. de Habana 17100 / CU | 09 /
GIGATO PÉREZ, Regnar Calle 206, No. 1922 entre 19 y 21 Atabey Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | 10 /
RUIZ ESQUIVEL, Leonardo Calle 28, No. 255 Apto. 3 entre 21 y 23 Vedado Plaza de la Revolucion Cuba 12300 / CU | 11 /
NOA BLANCO, Maria Dolores Calle 10, No. 125 entre 1ra y 5ta Miramar Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | 12 /
JAVERT HIGGINSON, Elisa Calle 232 Edif. 14 Apto. 11, Rpto. San Agustin La Lisa Ciudad de Habana 13600 / CU | [2009/42] |
Former [2003/11] | 01 /
RIVERON ROJAS, Ana Maria Calle 21 A, No. 20614 entre 206A y 214 Atabey Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | ||
02 /
LOPEZ CANOVA, Lilia Calle 21A, No. 20614 entre 206A y 214 Atabey Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | |||
03 /
ARENCIBIA DIAZ, Oscar Calle 174 Edif. BBE-1 Apto. 6 Rto. FLORES Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | |||
04 /
HERRERA ISIDRON, Jose Alfredo Calle 174 Edif. BBE-2 Apto. 14, Rpto Flores Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | |||
05 /
PEREZ PEREZ, Gabriel Calle 25, No. 868 Apto. 1, Vedado Plaza de la Revolucion Cuba 10400 / CU | |||
06 /
OROZCO OROZCO, Esther Via Ceti No. 20 Fracc. Luis Enrique Erro Planetario Lindavista Mexico, D.F. 07000 / MX | |||
07 /
CANINO RAMOS, Carlos Alberto Clle 192 Calle 192 No.1991 entre 199 y 201 Maria del Carmen Boyeros Ciudad de Habana 19200 / CU | |||
08 /
BATISTA SANTILER, Luis Mariano Ave 31, No. 31206 entre 312 y 316 Juan de Dios Fraga Ciud. de Habana 17100 / CU | |||
09 /
GIGATO P REZ, Regnar Calle 206, No. 1922 entre 19 y 21 Atabey Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | |||
10 /
RUIZ ESQUIVEL, Leonardo Calle 28, No. 255 Apto. 3 entre 21 y 23 Vedado Plaza de la Revolucion Cuba 12300 / CU | |||
11 /
NOA BLANCO, Maria Dolores Calle 10, No. 125 entre 1ra y 5ta Miramar Playa Ciudad de Habana 12100 / CU | |||
12 /
JAVERT HIGGINSON, Elisa Calle 232 Edif. 14 Apto. 11, Rpto. San Agustin La Lisa Ciudad de Habana 13600 / CU | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01942956.2 | 07.06.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001CU00003 | Priority number, date | CU20130000500 | 07.06.2000 Original published format: CU 13500 | CU30600 | 27.12.2000 Original published format: CU 30600 | [2003/11] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0194932 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1291649 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1291649 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
G01N27/44773 (EP,US);
G01N27/44704 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | G01N27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPHORESE-KAMMER IN PULSIERENDEM FELD, ZUBEHÖR UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR DIE TRENNUNG VON DNA-MOLEKÜLEN | [2003/11] | English: | PULSED FIELD ELECTROPHORESIS CHAMBERS, ACCESSORIES AND METHOD OF UTILIZATION FOR SEPARATION OF DNA MOLECULES | [2003/11] | French: | CHAMBRES D'ELECTROPHORESE EN CHAMP PULSE, ACCESSOIRES ET METHODE D'UTILISATION POUR LA SEPARATION DE MOLECULES D'ADN | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2002 | Translation filed | 07.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.10.2009 | BE | 14.10.2009 | CY | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | IT | 14.10.2009 | NL | 14.10.2009 | SE | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | GR | 15.01.2010 | GB | 07.06.2010 | IE | 07.06.2010 | LU | 07.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | FR | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
NL | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
GB | 07.06.2010 | ||
IE | 07.06.2010 | ||
LU | 07.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
GB | 07.06.2010 | ||
IE | 07.06.2010 | ||
LU | 07.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
GB | 07.06.2010 | ||
IE | 07.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
GB | 07.06.2010 | ||
IE | 07.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
IE | 07.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
IE | 07.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
IE | 07.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | Cited in | International search | [PA]ES2147174 (THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STRANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY) [PA] 1-5,19,22-26,34,39,43 * the whole document *; | [A]US4740283 (LAAS WILLIAM A [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7,9-22,27,28,34,37,40-42,44 * the whole document *; | [A]US5084157 (CLARK STEVEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-5,19,22-26,34,39,43 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2249395 (BIO RAD LABORATORIES [US]) [A] 1,22,34,43* page 5, line 14 - page 9, line 32 *; | [A]EP0745844 (CENT NAC INVESTIG SCIENT [CU]) [A] 1,19,21,22,34,37 * the whole document *; | [A]US6063250 (BECKER ROBERT G [US]) [A] 1,22 * figure - *; | [PA]WO0107150 (KAHL JOHAN VALENTIN [DE], et al) [PA] 1,22,34 * page 2, line 27 - line 31; claim - * |