EP1286660 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION IN LIQUID FORM FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF AN ACTIVE PRINCIPLE, WITH UNPLEASANT, IN PARTICULAR BITTER, TASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATOIRES CRINEX 3 Rue de Gentilly 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2006/39] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states LABORATOIRES CRINEX 3 Rue de Gentilly 92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDAMME, Thierry 6, rue Bastian F-67200 Strasbourg / FR | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2003/10] | Bernasconi, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01943573.4 | 06.06.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001FR01748 | Priority number, date | FR20000007364 | 08.06.2000 Original published format: FR 0007364 | [2003/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0193834 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1286660 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1286660 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/107 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
A61K9/1075 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGE ARZNEIZUBEREITUNGEN FÜR DIE ORALE VERABREICHUNG VON UNANGENEHM, BITTERSCHMECKENDEN ARZNEIMITTELN | [2003/10] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION IN LIQUID FORM FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION OF AN ACTIVE PRINCIPLE, WITH UNPLEASANT, IN PARTICULAR BITTER, TASTE | [2003/10] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE SOUS FORME LIQUIDE DESTINEE A L'ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE ORALE D'UN PRINCIPE ACTIF, AYANT UN GOUT DESAGREABLE, NOTAMMENT UN GOUT AMER | [2003/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 20.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2006 | CY | 27.09.2006 | FI | 27.09.2006 | GB | 27.09.2006 | IE | 27.09.2006 | IT | 27.09.2006 | NL | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | SE | 27.12.2006 | DE | 28.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | ES | 07.01.2007 | PT | 13.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CY | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
DE | 28.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
DE | 28.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
DE | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
DE | 28.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
SE | 27.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2331458 (MOONGA GURSHARAN SINGH [GB]) [X] 1-17,19,23,24 * claims 4,6 *; | [PX]WO0101960 (LIPOCINE INC [US]) [PX] 1-24 * claims 1,3,6,14,50-52 * * page 21 - page 22; tables 6,7 ** page 48, line 6 * |