EP1297264 - CLIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pointflame Limited Windsor House Barnett Way Barnwood Gloucestershire GL4 3RT / GB | [2006/05] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Pointflame Limited Group House, Bowling Hill Business Park, Quarry Road Chipping Sodbury Bristol BS37 6JL / GB | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Pointflame Limited Group House, Bowling Hill Business Park, Quarry Road Chipping Sodbury, Bristol BS37 6JL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLWOOD, Simon Maddockland Amberley Stroud Glos. GL5 5AF / GB | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01943637.7 | 25.06.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001GB02837 | Priority number, date | GB20000015860 | 28.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0015860 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0201083 | Date: | 03.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1297264 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1297264 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16B2/22, F16B2/10 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
F16B2/20 (EP,US);
F16B2/10 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3433 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3437 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3443 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAMMER | [2003/14] | English: | CLIP | [2003/14] | French: | PINCE | [2003/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 27.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 04.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Request for further processing for: | 28.04.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR | Licencee: | Altrax Group Limited Group House, Bowling Hill Business Park Chipping Sodbury, Bristol, South Gloucestershire B / GB | Date: | 19.05.2003 | [2005/35] |
Former [2003/46] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | Altrax Group Limited Group House, Bowling Hill Business Park Chipping Sodbury, Bristol, South Gloucestershire BS17 6JL / GB | ||
Date: | 19.05.2003 | ||
[2005/35] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | CY | 31.08.2005 | FI | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | TR | 31.08.2005 | DK | 30.11.2005 | GR | 30.11.2005 | SE | 30.11.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
TR | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
DK | 30.11.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
GR | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 31.08.2005 | |
FI | 31.08.2005 | ||
SE | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]BE539191 (LAMINOIRS DE L'ESCAUT) [X] 1,3-6,9 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [X]GB676087 (TINNERMAN PRODUCTS INC) [X] 1,3-6 * page 2, line 74 - page 3, line 1; figures 1-4 *; | [X]FR2630955 (BOULEY JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1,2,9* page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 18; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5214825 (HIRZEL SUZY C [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract *; | [X]WO9419561 (BELTRAMI PIETRO ANTONIO [IT]) [X] 1,3-6,9 * page 8, line 3 - line 26 * * page 10, line 5 - line 13 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 1; figures 1,2,5,7-9 *; | [X]US5964356 (GAREAU DAVID [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,4,9,16 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-5 * |