EP1289520 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEPRESSION COMPRISING FAMOTIDINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RICHTER GEDEON VEGYÉSZETI GYÁR RT Gyömröi ut 19-21 1103 Budapest X / HU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states RICHTER GEDEON VEGYESZETI GYAR R.T. Gyömröi ut 19-21 1103 Budapest X / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RACZ, Anna Széher ut 55/A H-1021 Budapest / HU | 02 /
KOVACS, Péter Vasvári Pál u. 28/A H-4028 Debrecen / HU | 03 /
VARGA, Csilla Bazsalikom ut 38. H-4400 Nyiregyháza / HU | [2005/01] |
Former [2003/11] | 01 /
RACZ, Anna Széher (RTM)t 55/A H-1021 Budapest / HU | ||
02 /
KOVACS, Péter Vasvári Pál u. 28/A H-4028 Debrecen / HU | |||
03 /
VARGA, Csilla Bazsalikom (RTM)t 38. H-4400 Nyiregyháza / HU | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/11] | Bösl, Raphael, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01943711.0 | 06.06.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001HU00065 | Priority number, date | HU20000002154P | 06.06.2000 Original published format: HU 0002154 P | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0193863 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1289520 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1289520 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/341, A61P25/24 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
A61K31/341 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND FAMOTIDINE FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON DEPRESSIONEN | [2003/11] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEPRESSION COMPRISING FAMOTIDINE | [2003/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DEPRESSION OU DES SYMPTOMES DE LA DEPRESSION | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 29.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5352688 (KAMINSKI RAM [US]) [X] 1,4 * abstract *; | [X]WO9501784 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract *; | [X]WO9501780 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4* abstract *; | [X] - MOLINARI S P ET AL, "THE USE OF FAMOTIDINE IN THE TREATMENT OF PARKINSON'S DISEASE: A PILOT STUDY", JOURNAL OF NEURAL TRANSMISSION, SPRINGER VERLAG, VIENNA, AT, (19950823), vol. 9, no. 2/3, ISSN 0300-9564, pages 243 - 247, XP000673243 [X] 1,4 * page 245, paragraph 3 * * abstract * | [X] - DANNON P N ET AL, "Famotidine: A supplemental drug for the treatment of schizophrenia.", EUROPEAN PSYCHIATRY, (1997), vol. 12, no. 5, ISSN 0924-9338, pages 263 - 264, XP002188477 [X] 1,4 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-9338(97)83302-0 |