EP1306432 - HUMAN II TYPE 5 ALPHA-REDUCTASE PROMOTER GENE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANISHI, Jotaro, c/o Shiseido Research Center Kanazawa-hakkei, 2-12-1, Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, kanagawa 236-8643 / JP | 02 /
HIBINO, Toshihiko, c/o Shiseido Research Center Kanazawa-hakkei,2-12-1, Fukuura, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-8643 / JP | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01943855.5 | 28.06.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001JP05549 | Priority number, date | JP20000228757 | 28.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000228757 | [2003/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0210376 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1306432 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N5/10, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/68 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
C12N9/001 (EP,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
C12N2830/00 (EP,US);
C12N2830/85 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | MENSCHLICHE GENE DES 5-ALPHA REDUKTASE PROMOTORS DES TYPS II UND DEREN ANWENDUNGEN | [2003/18] | English: | HUMAN II TYPE 5 ALPHA-REDUCTASE PROMOTER GENE AND USE THEREOF | [2003/18] | French: | GENE HUMAIN DU PROMOTEUR DE LA 5 ALPHA REDUCTASE DE TYPE II ET UTILISATION ASSOCIEE | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2003 | Translation filed | 13.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 22.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/27] | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO0200928 (EPIGENOMICS AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-8* There is 71,03% identity in 2751 nt overlap (total 6022) of SEQ ID NO: 1 (1-6022) with SEQ ID NO: 1720, including 6952(T) *; | [XY] - HAZAN,J. ET AL., "BAC sequence from the SPG4 candidate region at 2p21-2p22 BAC 11B22 of library CITB_978_SKB from chromosome 2 of homo sapiens", EMBL/GENBANK/DDBJ, (19991129), Database accession no. AL133247, URL: EBI, XP002278861 [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-5 | [XY] - BIRREN, B. ET AL., "Homo sapiens chromosome 2 clone RP11-15P15 map 2", EMBL/GENBANK/DDBJ, (20000412), Database accession no. AC041037, URL: EBI, XP002278862 [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2-5 | International search | [X] - LABRIE F. ET AL., "Structure of human type II 5 alpha-reductase gene", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (199209), vol. 131, no. 3, pages 1571 - 1573, XP002946693 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.131.3.1571 | [Y] - WINGENDER E. ET AL., "TRANSFAC: a database on transcription factors and their DNA binding sites", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (19960101), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 238 - 241, XP002946694 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/24.1.238 | [A] - ANDERSSON S. ET AL., "Deletion of steroid 5 alpha-reductase 2 gene in male pseudohermaphroditism", NATURE, (19911114), vol. 354, no. 6349, pages 159 - 161, XP002946695 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/354159a0 | [A] - LISTON D.R. ET AL., "Upstream regulatory sequences required for expression of the trichomonas vaginalis alpha-succinyl CoA synthetase gene", MOL. BIOCHEM. PARASITOL., (19991130), vol. 104, no. 2, pages 323 - 329, XP002946696 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-6851(99)00137-1 |