EP1290480 - FIBER OPTIC CABLE CONNECTORS FOR DOWNHOLE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford/Lamb, Inc. 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | ||
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUBINO, Robert, A. 296 Weigold Road Tolland, CT 06457 / US | 02 /
MISHRIKY, Nabil, E. 14 Myrtle Road Portland, CT 06480 / US | 03 /
CAISSE, Daniel 340 Porter Street Manchester, CT 06040 / US | 04 /
GUMPRECHT, Peter 164 Oak Street Southington, CT 06489 / US | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01944146.8 | 16.05.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001US15792 | Priority number, date | US20000594645 | 15.06.2000 Original published format: US 594645 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0225340 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1290480 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1290480 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
G02B6/3831 (EP,US);
G02B6/3878 (EP,US);
G02B6/3883 (EP,US);
G02B6/3816 (EP,US);
G02B6/3822 (EP,US);
G02B6/3847 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASEROPTISCHE STECKER FÜR BOHRLOCHANWENDUNGEN | [2003/11] | English: | FIBER OPTIC CABLE CONNECTORS FOR DOWNHOLE APPLICATIONS | [2003/11] | French: | CONNECTEURS DE CABLES A FIBRES OPTIQUES POUR DES APPLICATIONS EN PUITS | [2009/04] |
Former [2003/11] | CONNECTEURS DE CABLES A FIBRES OPTIQUES CON US POUR DES APPLICATIONS EN PUITS | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 22.07.2009 | [2010/10] | Cited in | International search | [X]US4225214 (HODGE MALCOLM H, et al) [X] 1-3,8 * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 43 * * column 12, line 18 - line 58 * * figures 2-4,9,10,18 *; | [X]US5590229 (GOLDMAN ROBERT P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 34 * * column 8, line 31 - column 9, line 53 * * figures 2-4,6 *; | [XA]US4801191 (NAKAI SINICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 7 - column 5, line 44 * * figures 1-7 * * idem * [A] 8,11; | [A]US5064268 (MORENCY ROGER L [US], et al) [A] 1,8,10 * figure - * * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 2 *; | [A]US5018822 (FREISMUTH JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6,8,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4759601 (KNUTSEN GARY F [US], et al) [A] 1,8-10 * column 1, line 12 - column 12, line 68 * * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 53 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 31 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5301213 (LINDEN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 11,12 * column 3, line 14 - line 48 * * figure - * | Examination | US4140367 |