EP1287146 - COLD SENSITIVE MUTANT DNA POLYMERASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Washington University 1 Brookings Drive St. Louis, MO 63130 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY 1 Brookings Drive St. Louis, MO 63130 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNES, Wayne, M. 11 Princeton Avenue University City, MO 63130 / US | 02 /
KERMEKCHIEV, Milko, B. 6665 West Park Avenue St. Louis, MO 63139 / US | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01944300.1 | 05.06.2001 | [2003/10] | WO2001US18236 | Priority number, date | US20000587856 | 06.06.2000 Original published format: US 587856 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0194562 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1287146 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1287146 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, C12N15/10, C12N15/66, C12N9/12, C12Q1/68 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
C12N9/1252 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/686, C12Q2549/107, C12Q2527/101, C12Q2521/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄLTEEMPFINDLICHE DNA-POLYMERASEMUTANTEN | [2003/10] | English: | COLD SENSITIVE MUTANT DNA POLYMERASES | [2003/10] | French: | POLYMERASES D'ADN MUTANTES SENSIBLES AU FROID | [2003/10] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 30.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.08.2005 | FI | 17.08.2005 | IT | 17.08.2005 | NL | 17.08.2005 | TR | 17.08.2005 | DK | 17.11.2005 | GR | 17.11.2005 | SE | 17.11.2005 | PT | 17.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/36] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
IT | 17.08.2005 | ||
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
NL | 17.08.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
SE | 17.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
SE | 17.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9206188 (BARNES WAYNE M [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9426766 (BARNES WAYNE M [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9641010 (NEXSTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9840496 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [A] * Mutation E681G;;; claims 1-15 *; | [A]EP0902035 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] * page 3, line 44 - line 51 * * page 6, line 21 - line 28; claims 1-26 *; | [A] - NAGANO KOHJI ET AL, "fcsA29 mutation is an allele of polA gene of Escherichia coli.", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, (199902), vol. 63, no. 2, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 427 - 429, XP002190820 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.63.427 | [A] - BARNES W M, "THE FIDELITY OF TAQ POLYMERASE CATALYZING PCR IS IMPROVED BY AN N-TERMINAL DELETION", GENE, ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (199204), vol. 112, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 29 - 35, XP002915507 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(92)90299-5 | [A] - BARNES W M, "PCR AMPLIFICATION OF UP TO 35-KB DNA WITH HIGH FIDELITY AND HIGH YIELD FROM LAMBDA BACTERIOPHAGE TEMPLATES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19940301), vol. 91, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2216 - 2220, XP002030133 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.6.2216 | [A] - KELLOGG ET AL, "TaqStart Antibody", BIOTECHNIQUES, EATON PUBLISHING, NATICK, US, (1994), vol. 16, no. 6, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 1134 - 1137, XP002103159 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - HORTON R M ET AL, "AMPLIGREASE: HOT START PCR USING PETROLEUM JELLY", BIOTECHNIQUES, EATON PUBLISHING, NATICK, US, (1994), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 42 - 43, XP000420681 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - HANSEN H ET AL, "AUTOMATED HOT START PCR USING MINERAL OIL AND PARAFFIN WAX", BIOTECHNIQUES, EATON PUBLISHING, NATICK, US, (1993), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 30 - 34, XP000331736 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - CADWELL R AND JOYCE G ET AL, "Randomization of genes by PCR mutagenesis", PCR METHODS AND APPLICATIONS, COLD SPRING HARBOR, NY, US, (1992), vol. 2, ISSN 1054-9803, pages 28 - 33, XP002087462 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - CHOU Q ET AL, "PREVENTION OF PRE-PCR MIS-PRIMING AND PRIMER DIMERIZATION IMPROVES LOW-COPY-NUMBER AMPLIFICATIONS", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 20, no. 7, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 1717 - 1723, XP002190821 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - B. HÉBERT ET AL., "Increased PCR sensitivity by using paraffin wax as a reaction mix overlay", MOL. AND CELL. PROBES, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, US, (1993), vol. 7, pages 249 - 252, XP002190822 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcpr.1993.1036 |