EP1292712 - MEANS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING ANTIRETROVIRAL THERAPY AND GUIDING THERAPEUTIC DECISIONS IN THE TREATMENT OF HIV/AIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monogram BioSciences, Inc. 345 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080-1913 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Monogram Biosciences, Inc. 345 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080-1913 / US | ||
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Virologic, Inc. 270 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITCOMB, Jeannette 2260 Cobblehill Place San Mateo, CA 94402 / US | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Tollervey, Rebecca Marie, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Tollervey, Rebecca Marie, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2006/22] | Hodsdon, Stephen James Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2006/15] | Ricker, Mathias, et al Jones Day, Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | Denison, Christopher Marcus Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01944452.0 | 12.06.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001US18882 | Priority number, date | US20000591894 | 12.06.2000 Original published format: US 591894 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0196611 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292712 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/70 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12Q1/703 (EP);
C12N2740/16043 (EP);
C12N2740/16122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR UEBERWACHUNG VON ANTIRETROVIRALER THERAPIE UND ZUR HINFÜHRUNG ZU THERAPEUTISCHEN ENTSCHEIDUNGEN BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON HIV/AIDS | [2003/12] | English: | MEANS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING ANTIRETROVIRAL THERAPY AND GUIDING THERAPEUTIC DECISIONS IN THE TREATMENT OF HIV/AIDS | [2003/12] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES POUR LE CONTROLE DE THERAPIE ANTIRETROVIRALE ET L'ORIENTATION DES DECISIONS THERAPEUTIQUES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU VIH/SIDA | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 26.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/24] | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/24] | Request for further processing for: | 15.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 15.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9727332 (INNOGENETICS NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 11; table 2 *; | [Y]WO9727480 (VIRCO NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-6 * claim 1; table 9 * * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 17 *; | [X]WO9961658 (VIROLOGIC INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * examples 6,7,10-14,16-18; claims 1-72 *; | [Y] - CLERCQ DE E, "DEVELOPMENT OF RESISTANCE OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) TO ANTI-HIV AGENTS: HOW TO PREVENT THE PROBLEM?", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1997), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 0924-8579, pages 21 - 36, XP000878561 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0924-8579(97)00031-9 | [Y] - SALOMON H ET AL, "Prevalence of HIV-1 resistant to antiretroviral drugs in 81 individuals newly infected by sexual contact or injecting drug use. Investigators of the Quebec Primary Infection Study.", AIDS (LONDON, ENGLAND) 28 JAN 2000, (20000128), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 0269-9370, pages F17 - F23, XP008037438 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00002030-200001280-00003 | [Y] - MELLORS J W ET AL, "MUTATIONS IN HIV-1 REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE AND PROTEASE ASSOCIATED WITH DRUG RESISTANCE", INTERNATIONAL ANTIVIRAL NEWS, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, EDINBURGH, GB, (1995), vol. 3, ISSN 0965-2310, pages 8 - 13, XP000614717 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * | [Y] - HOLODNIY M ET AL, "Determination of human immunodeficiency virus RNA in plasma and cellular viral DNA genotypic zidovudine resistance and viral load during zidovudine-didanosine combination therapy.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY. JUN 1995, (199506), vol. 69, no. 6, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 3510 - 3516, XP002317435 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * | [Y] - PELEMANS H ET AL, "CHARACTERISTICS OF THE PRO225HIS MUTATION IN HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCYVIRUS TYPE 1 (HIV-1) REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE THAT APPEARS UNDER SELECTIVE PRESSURE OF DOSE-ESCALATING QUINOXALINE TREATMENT OF HIV-1", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (199711), vol. 71, no. 11, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 8195 - 8203, XP000885693 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - KANKI P J ET AL, "VIROLOGY OF HIV-1 AND HIV-2: IMPLICATIONS FOR AFRICA", AIDS, LONDON, GB, (1997), vol. 11, no. SUPPL B, ISSN 0269-9370, pages S33 - S42, XP008035289 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00002030-199701000-00006 | International search | [A]US5917033 (MODAK MUKUND J [US], et al) |