Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1294227
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.05.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |
03.02.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.07.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.08.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
14.08.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
02.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
07.02.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
29.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|