EP1198694 - OPTICAL SENSOR FOR MEASURING THE DISTANCE AND INCLINATION OF A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/17] | OPTICAL SENSOR FOR MEASURING THE DISTANCE AND/OR INCLINATION OF A SURFACE | ||
[2009/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss MicroImaging GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | [2009/50] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states CARL ZEISS JENA GMBH CARL-ZEISS-PROMENADE 10 07745 JENA / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Stefan Kanalstr. 63 24159 Kiel / DE | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Hampe, Holger Carl Zeiss Jena GmbH Zentralbereich Recht und Patente Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Hampe, Holger Carl Zeiss Jena GmbH, Zentralbereich Recht und Patente, Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | ||
Former [2009/50] | Hampe, Holger C/o Carl Zeiss AG Standort Jena Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 01945110.3 | 10.05.2001 | [2002/17] | WO2001EP05336 | Priority number, date | DE2000126830 | 30.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10026830 | [2002/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0192819 | Date: | 06.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198694 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198694 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, G01B11/25 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
G01B11/24 (EP,US);
G01B11/026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/17] | G01B11/02, G01B11/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER SENSOR ZUR MESSUNG DES ABSTANDS UND DER NEIGUNG EINER FLÄCHE | [2009/28] | English: | OPTICAL SENSOR FOR MEASURING THE DISTANCE AND INCLINATION OF A SURFACE | [2009/28] | French: | DETECTEUR OPTIQUE SERVANT A MESURER LA DISTANCE ET L'INCLINAISON D'UNE SURFACE | [2009/28] |
Former [2002/17] | OPTISCHER SENSOR ZUR MESSUNG DES ABSTANDS UND/ODER DER NEIGUNG EINER FLÄCHE | ||
Former [2002/17] | OPTICAL SENSOR FOR MEASURING THE DISTANCE AND/OR INCLINATION OF A SURFACE | ||
Former [2002/17] | DETECTEUR OPTIQUE SERVANT A MESURER LA DISTANCE ET/OU L'INCLINAISON D'UNE SURFACE NOTAMMENT PAR RAPPORT A UN PLAN DE REFERENCE | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 12.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.12.2009 | DK | 30.12.2009 | FI | 30.12.2009 | IE | 30.12.2009 | IT | 30.12.2009 | NL | 30.12.2009 | SE | 30.12.2009 | TR | 30.12.2009 | GR | 31.03.2010 | ES | 10.04.2010 | PT | 30.04.2010 | AT | 10.05.2010 | GB | 10.05.2010 | LU | 10.05.2010 | BE | 31.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | FR | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
AT | 10.05.2010 | ||
GB | 10.05.2010 | ||
LU | 10.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
AT | 10.05.2010 | ||
GB | 10.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
GB | 10.05.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
FR | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
BE | 31.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
SE | 30.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS58165007 ; | [A]EP0145957 (ZEISS CARL FA [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5-7 * die gesamte Druckschrift; ** figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE3407074 (RODENSTOCK OPTIK G [DE]) [A] 1,2,5-7 * die gesamte Druckschrift; * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO8807657 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * die gesamte Druckschrift; * * figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831224), vol. 007, no. 290, Database accession no. (P - 245), & JP58165007 A 19830930 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1,2,5-7 * abstract * |