EP1289521 - COMBINATION OF LIPOIC ACID AND C 1 DONORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISORDERS OF THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄHNLEIN, Wolfgang Am Rosenbühl 11a 67251 Freinsheim / DE | 02 /
KRÄMER, Klaus Daniel-Knobloch-Strasse 4 76829 Landau / DE | 03 /
HASSELWANDER, Oliver Hamburger Strasse 52 76829 Landau / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER, Walter, E. Höhenstrasse 49a 67550 Worms / DE | 05 /
ECKERT, Günther, P. Erlenweg 20 65835 Liederbach a.T. / DE | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patent Attorneys, Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner, Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01945113.7 | 10.05.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001EP05359 | Priority number, date | DE2000122856 | 10.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10022856 | [2003/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0185165 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1289521 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/385, A61K31/7076, A61K31/519, A61P25/00, // A61K31:7076, A61K31:385, A61K31:519, A61K31:385 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
A61K31/385 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/385, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7076, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 09.12.2002 | LV | 09.12.2002 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 09.12.2002 | SI | 09.12.2002 | Title | German: | KOMBINATION VON LIPONSÄURE UND C 1-DONOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STÖRUNGEN DES ZENTRALEN NERVENSYSTEMS | [2003/11] | English: | COMBINATION OF LIPOIC ACID AND C 1 DONORS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISORDERS OF THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM | [2003/11] | French: | COMBINAISON D'ACIDE LIPOIQUE ET DE DONNEURS D'UNITES C 1 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 16.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.03.2008 | 12.03.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/51] | 10.08.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/51] | Request for further processing for: | 25.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.11.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR4630M (C.E.R.E.T.) [X] 7-9 * siehe insbesondere S. 1, linke Spalte, Z. 5-9; S. 2, linke Spalte, 2. Formel; S. 2, rechte Spalte, vorletzer Paragraph *; | [Y]US4057686 (FIECCHI ALBERTO) [Y] 1-9 * siehe insbesondere Spalte 22, Z. 47 - Spalte 23, Z. 59 *; | [YD]EP0388827 (BIORESEARCH SPA [IT]) [YD] 1-9 * siehe insbesondere S. 6-7, Tabelle 3; Fig. 2 und 3; Anspruch 1 *; | [X]US5292538 (PAUL STEPHEN M [US], et al) [X] 7-9 * siehe insbesondere Spalte 1, Z. 15-26; Spalten 11 und 12 *; | [Y]DE4343592 (ASTA MEDICA AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * siehe insbesondere S. 2, Z. 24-26; S. 4, Z. 48-65; Anspruch 1 *; | [DY] - STOLL, S. (1) ET AL, "The potent free radical scavenger alpha - lipoic acid improves cognition in rodents.", ZS.-NAGY, I. [EDITOR];HARMAN, D. [EDITOR]; KITANI, K. [EDITOR]. ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (1994) VOL. 717, PP. 122-128. ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES; PHARMACOLOGY OF AGING PROCESSES: METHODS OF ASSESSMENT AND POTENTIAL, XP001029748 [DY] 1-9 * siehe insbesondere S. 122, Einleitung; S. 126 und S. 127, Diskussion; Fig. 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1994.tb12079.x | [Y] - PASSERI M ET AL, "ORAL 5 METHYLTETRAHYDROFOLATE MTHF IN DEPRESSION ASSOCIATED WITH SENILE ORGANIC MENTAL DISORDERS OMDS A DOUBLE-BLIND MULTICENTER STUDY VS TRAZODONE TRZ.", 25TH MEETING OF THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, PISA, ITALY, APRIL 3-6, 1991. EUR J CLIN INVEST. (1991) 21 (2 PART 2), 24., XP001029044 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * |