EP1216548 - DATA DELIVERY THROUGH PORTABLE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIES, Robert, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
RANKIN, Paul, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/26] | White, Andrew Gordon, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited, Patents and Trade Marks Department, Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01945284.6 | 18.06.2001 | [2002/26] | WO2001EP06941 | Priority number, date | GB20000015454 | 26.06.2000 Original published format: GB 0015454 | GB20000020098 | 15.08.2000 Original published format: GB 0020098 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0201804 | Date: | 03.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216548 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1216548 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/56 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04B1/713 (EP,US);
H04W84/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERMITTLUNG DURCH PORTABLE GERÄTE | [2002/26] | English: | DATA DELIVERY THROUGH PORTABLE DEVICES | [2002/26] | French: | DISTRIBUTION DE DONNEES PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE DE DISPOSITIFS PORTATIFS | [2002/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 09.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.2007 | BE | 07.03.2007 | CH | 07.03.2007 | CY | 07.03.2007 | DK | 07.03.2007 | FI | 07.03.2007 | IT | 07.03.2007 | LI | 07.03.2007 | NL | 07.03.2007 | TR | 07.03.2007 | SE | 07.06.2007 | GR | 08.06.2007 | ES | 18.06.2007 | IE | 18.06.2007 | LU | 18.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | PT | 07.08.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
IE | 18.06.2007 | ||
LU | 18.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
IE | 18.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
IE | 18.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 07.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9848969 (NIEDERNDORFER FRIEDRICH [AT], et al) [A] 1-17* claim - *; | [X]US6020810 (HAR-EVEN EVA A [US]) [X] 1,14,17 * column W *; | [A] - HAARTSEN J ET AL, "BLUETOOTH: VISION, GOALS, AND ARCHITECTURE", MOBILE COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS REVIEW, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19981001), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 38 - 45, XP000784002 [A] 1-17 * page 41, column L, line 43 - page 41, column R, line 60 * | Examination | WO0201811 | WO0201812 | WO0201813 | WO0201814 |