EP1212814 - PUMPED LASER AND OPTIMISED LASING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2019/08] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Thales 173, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEUGNET, Gilles, @Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 02 /
LALLIER, Eric, @Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 03 /
LARAT, Christian, @Thales Intellectual Property 13, av. du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 04 /
POCHOLLE, Jean-Paul, @Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | 05 /
ROLLY, Didier, @Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Pres. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil cedex / FR | [2019/18] |
Former [2002/24] | 01 /
FEUGNET, Gilles, Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
02 /
LALLIER, Eric, Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | |||
03 /
LARAT, Christian, Thales Intellectual Property 13, av. du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | |||
04 /
POCHOLLE, Jean-Paul, Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Prés. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | |||
05 /
ROLLY, Didier, Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Pres. Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil cedex / FR | Representative(s) | Dudouit, Isabelle, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | Dudouit, Isabelle, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/33] | Dudouit, Isabelle, et al Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/24] | Dudouit, Isabelle, et al Thales Intelectual Property 13, avenue Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01945399.2 | 12.06.2001 | [2002/24] | WO2001FR01813 | Priority number, date | FR20000008519 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: FR 0008519 | [2002/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0201683 | Date: | 03.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212814 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212814 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/0941 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
H01S3/09415 (EP,US);
H01S3/0672 (EP,US);
H01S3/06729 (EP,US);
H01S3/08045 (EP,US);
H01S3/094057 (EP,US);
H01S5/005 (EP,US);
H01S5/4025 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2019/18] |
Former [2004/22] | DE | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | GEPUMPTER LASER UND OPTIMIERTES LASERMEDIUM | [2002/24] | English: | PUMPED LASER AND OPTIMISED LASING MEDIUM | [2002/24] | French: | LASER POMPE ET MILIEU LASER OPTIMISE | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 22.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0570743 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10 * column 3, line 35 - line 55 * [A] 12,14; | [XA]US5877890 (SNITZER ELIAS [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * column 1 - column 2 * [A] 12,14; | [A] - FEUGNET G ET AL, "HIGH-EFFICIENCY TEM00 ND:YVO4 LASER LONGITUDINALLY PUMPED BY A HIGH-POWER ARRAY", OPTICS LETTERS,US,OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, (19950115), vol. 20, no. 2, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 157 - 159, XP000486637 [A] 1,7,8,10 * the whole document * | Examination | JPH07321394 |