EP1294589 - AN ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION ALERTING DEVICE FOR USE WITH A CELLULAR TELEPHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wireless Avionics Ltd. 22 Hamelacha, New Industrial Area Rosh Haayin 48091 / IL | [2003/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLACH, Alon 39 Sharet Street 52413 Ramat Gan / IL | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH, Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01945591.4 | 27.06.2001 | [2003/13] | WO2001IL00585 | Priority number, date | US20000214491P | 27.06.2000 Original published format: US 214491 P | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0200468 | Date: | 03.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1294589 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/00, H04B1/38 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
H04B1/3838 (EP,US);
H04B2001/3844 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/13] | B60Q1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WARNEINRICHTUNG FÜR ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE STRAHLUNGEN ZUM GEBRAUCH MIT ZELLULAREM TELEFON | [2003/13] | English: | AN ELECTROMAGNETIC RADIATION ALERTING DEVICE FOR USE WITH A CELLULAR TELEPHONE | [2003/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALARME POUR RAYONNEMENT ELECTROMAGNETIQUE DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE AVEC UN TELEPHONE CELLLULAIRE | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 31.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2003 | 30.06.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10320668 ; | [A]JPH1133125 ; | [A]JPH09102766 ; | [Y]US5336896 (KATZ JOSEPH M [US]) [Y] 14,17 * column 2, line 44 - line 63 * * column 3, line 25 - line 37 * * figure 5 *; | [YX]WO9503549 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,7-9,12-14,17,18,23,24,29,31,33-35,39-41 * page 1, line 26 - line 29 * * page 1, line 40 - page 2, line 3 * * page 3, line 26 - line 32 * * page 4, line 36 - page 5, line 3 * * page 5, line 13 - line 22 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * [X] 28; | [Y]US5524275 (LINDELL BO K [SE]) [Y] 3,8,29,35 * column 1, line 12 - line 32 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 3 * * column 9, line 30 - line 34 *; | [Y]US5749909 (SCHROEPPEL EDWARD A [US], et al) [Y] 5,12,23,24 * column 1, line 7 - line 9 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 5 *; | [Y]US5907307 (BICKERT PAUL F [CA], et al) [Y] 1,7,13,31,34,39,41 * column 3, line 38 - line 42 * * column 4, line 2 - line 21 *; | [Y]US5953646 (HIRASAWA NAOKI [JP]) [Y] 18 * column 2, line 3 - line 5 * * column 2, line 18 - line 22 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10320668 A 19981204 (NAGATA DENKI KK) [Y] 9,33,40 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11033125 A 19990209 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-41 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09102766 A 19970415 (CANON INC) [A] 1-41 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US5825283 (CAMHI ELIE [US]) |