EP1431232 - ELEVATOR HOIST AND ELEVATOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Koji, c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
MARUYAMA, Naoyuki, Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
YUMURA, Takashi, Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2012/45] |
Former [2004/26] | 01 /
OKADA, Koji, c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
MARUYAMA, Naoyuki, Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
YUMURA, Takashi, Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01945711.8 | 29.06.2001 | [2004/26] | WO2001JP05632 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03002448 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431232 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431232 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B66D5/08, B66D5/30 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
B66D5/30 (EP);
B66B11/08 (KR);
B66D5/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/17] | B66B11/08, B66D5/30 | ||
Former IPC [2004/26] | B66B11/08 | Designated contracting states | DE [2012/45] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | AUFZUGSANTRIEB | [2004/26] | English: | ELEVATOR HOIST AND ELEVATOR DEVICE | [2004/26] | French: | SYSTEME DE LEVAGE D'ASCENSEUR ET ASCENSEUR | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2003 | Translation filed | 26.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1860394 (OHLER FRANK L) [X] 1,2,4-10* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS472330B ; | [Y]JPS63133650U ; | [A]JPH10203761 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2001072358 (TEIJIN SEIKI CO LTD) |