EP1298132 - HYDROPYRIDINE DERIVATIVE ACID ADDITION SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sankyo Company, Limited 5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 1987-96, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-Shi Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | [2006/47] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Sankyo Company, Limited 5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | ||
For all designated states Ube Industries, Ltd. 1987-96, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-Shi, Yamaguchi 755-8633 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAI, Fumitoshi, c/o SANKYO COMPANY, Ltd 2-58, Hiromachi 1-Chome, Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 02 /
OGAWA, Taketoshi, c/o SANKYO COMPANY, Ltd 2-58, Hiromachi 1-Chome, Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 03 /
NAGANUMA, Hideo, c/o SANKYO COMPANY, Ltd 2-58, Hiromachi 1-Chome, Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMURA, Naotoshi, c/o SANKYO COMPANY, Ltd 2-58, Hiromachi 1-Chome, Shinagawa-Ku Tokyo 140-8710 / JP | 05 /
INOUE, Teruhiko, c/o Ube Research Laboratory Ube Industries Ltd, 1978-5, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-Shi, Yamaguchi 755-0067 / JP | 06 /
NAKAMURA, Kazuyoshi, c/o Ube Research Laboratory Ube Industries Ltd, 1978-5, O-Aza Kogushi Ube-Shi, Yamaguchi 755-0067 / JP | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Christian John Robert Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Gibson, Christian John Robert MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01945799.3 | 03.07.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001JP05764 | Priority number, date | JP20000205396 | 06.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000205396 | JP20000266780 | 04.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000266780 | [2003/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0204461 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1298132 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1298132 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D495/04, A61K31/4365, A61P7/02, A61P9/10 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
C07D495/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SÄURE-ADDITIONSSALZE VON HYDROPYRIDINDERIVATEN | [2003/14] | English: | HYDROPYRIDINE DERIVATIVE ACID ADDITION SALTS | [2003/14] | French: | SELS D'ADDITION ACIDES DE D RIV S HYDROPYRIDINE | [2003/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2003 | Translation filed | 31.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 31.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06017487.7 / EP1728794 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO02051412 (SANKYO CO [JP], et al) [E] 1-11; | EP1350511 [ ] (SANKYO CO [JP], et al) [ ] * claims 1-8; p. 3, l. 1-8 * | International search | [Y]JPS6422847 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [Y]EP0542411 (SANKYO CO [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH07188168 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO, et al); | [Y] - ASAI FUMITOSHI, "CS-747 a new platelet ADP receptor antagonist", ANNU. REP. SANKYO RES. LABORATORY, (1999), vol. 51, pages 1 - 44, XP002945691 | [Y] - SUGIDACHI ATSUHIRO, "The in vivo pharmacological profile of CS-747, a novel antiplatelet agent with platelet ADP receptor antagonist properties", BR. J. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 129, no. 7, pages 1439 - 1446, XP002945692 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0703237 |