EP1297345 - TARIFF GENERATION, INVOICING AND CONTRACT MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jimmi Limited Seal Bkr, Chartered Accountants, 137 Vincent Street Auckland / NZ | [2003/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Simon Venn 7 Tole Street Ponsonby, Auckland / NZ | 02 /
PHILPOTT, Andrew Bryan 87 Old Mill Road Westmere, Auckland / NZ | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2003/14] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01945842.1 | 22.06.2001 | [2003/14] | WO2001NZ00116 | Priority number, date | NZ20000505358 | 22.06.2000 Original published format: NZ 50535800 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0198787 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1297345 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/00 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 21.01.2003 | LV | 21.01.2003 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TARIF-ERSTELLUNG, FAKTURIERUNG UND VERWALTUNG VON VERTRÄGEN | [2003/14] | English: | TARIFF GENERATION, INVOICING AND CONTRACT MANAGEMENT | [2003/14] | French: | FORMATION DE TARIFS, GESTION EN MATIERE DE FACTURATION ET DE CONTRAT | [2003/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 21.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/49] | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |