EP1292544 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FORMING GLASS SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glasstech, Inc. 995 Fourth Street, Ampoint Industrial Park Perrysburg, OH 43552 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states GLASSTECH, INC. 995 Fourth Street, Ampoint Industrial Park Perrysburg, OH 43552 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCMASTER, Ronald, A. 29794 Foxhill Road Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | 02 /
VILD, Michael, J. 2526 Meadowwood Street Toledo, OH 43606 / US | 03 /
SHETTERLY, Donivan, M. 4 Indian Creek Drive Rudolph, OH 43462 / US | 04 /
DUCAT, Paul, D. 7322 Twin Lakes Road Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Higgs, Jonathan, et al Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Higgs, Jonathan, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes, MK9 1NE / GB | ||
Former [2008/49] | Higgs, Jonathan, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | ||
Former [2003/12] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 01946139.1 | 05.06.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001US18395 | Priority number, date | US20000594965 | 15.06.2000 Original published format: US 594965 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0196252 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292544 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C03B18/00, C03B23/02, C03B27/00, C03B23/03, C03B23/035, C03B35/14 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
C03B23/0357 (EP,US);
C03B23/035 (KR);
C03B23/0307 (EP,US);
C03B35/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/12] | C03B18/00, C03B23/02, C03B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BIEGEN VON GLASSSCHEIBEN | [2003/12] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FORMING GLASS SHEETS | [2003/12] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE FEUILLES DE VERRE | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 22.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/35] | 06.04.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4233049 (SEYMOUR SAMUEL L) [A] 12 * column 2, line 16 - line 39; figures 1,5-8 *; | [A]US4604124 (STRAUSS GOTTFRIED [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5320661 (FECIK MICHAEL T [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 53 - column 6, line 37; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US4711653 (FRANK ROBERT G [US], et al); | [A]US4746348 (FRANK ROBERT G [US]); | [X]US4859225 (KUSTER HANS-WERNER [DE], et al); | [A]US5004491 (MCMASTER RONALD A [US], et al); | [A]US5393316 (SUGIYAMA TATSUO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5755845 (WOODWARD ALAN CHARLES [GB], et al) |