EP1322565 - UV PHOTOSENSITIVE MELTED GERMANO-SILICATE GLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORRELLI, Nicholas, F. 935 West Water St. Elmira, NY 14905 / US | 02 /
HARES, George, B. 31 East Fourth Street Corning, NY 14831 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Charlene, M. 222 Watauga Avenue Corning, NY 14831 / US | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Marchant, James Ian Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01946162.3 | 06.06.2001 | [2003/27] | WO2001US18489 | Priority number, date | US20000221811P | 31.07.2000 Original published format: US 221811 P | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0210083 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1322565 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/064, C03C3/091, C03C3/118, G02B6/34, C03C23/00, C03C4/00, C03C4/04, G02B5/18, C03B19/02, C03B32/00 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
C03C3/118 (EP);
C03B19/02 (EP);
C03B32/00 (EP);
C03C17/3411 (EP);
C03C23/002 (EP);
C03C3/064 (EP);
C03C3/091 (EP);
C03C4/0085 (EP);
C03C4/04 (EP);
G02B6/12007 (EP);
G02B6/124 (EP);
G02B6/125 (EP);
C03B2201/21 (EP);
C03B2201/31 (EP);
C03C2201/21 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/27] | C03C3/064, C03C3/091, C03C3/118, G02B6/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UV-PHOTOSENSITIVE GESCHMOLZENE GERMANIUM-SILIKAT-GLÄSER | [2003/27] | English: | UV PHOTOSENSITIVE MELTED GERMANO-SILICATE GLASSES | [2003/27] | French: | VERRES A BASE DE GERMANO-SILICATE FONDU, PHOTOSENSIBLES AUX U.V. | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 14.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/30] | 05.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XP]US6229945 ; | [X]US6075625 ; | [X]US4097258 ; | [A]US6271160 ; | [A]US4390638 ; | [A]US4094689 |