EP1295054 - MICROVALVE FOR ELECTRONICALLY CONTROLLED TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY 12000 Tech Center Drive Livonia, MI 48150 / US | [2003/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNNICUTT, Harry, A. 1325 Folkstone Court Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | 02 /
FULLER, E., Nelson 17750 Sharon Valley Road Manchester, MI 48158 / US | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Beyer, Andreas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Beyer, Andreas, Dr. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01946577.2 | 20.06.2001 | [2003/13] | WO2001US19694 | Priority number, date | US20000602151 | 20.06.2000 Original published format: US 602151 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0198688 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1295054 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1295054 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, F15C5/00 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
F16K99/0001 (EP,US);
F15C5/00 (EP,US);
F16H61/0251 (EP,US);
F16K99/0011 (EP,US);
F16K99/0036 (EP,US);
F16K99/0042 (EP,US);
F16K99/0059 (EP,US);
F16K2099/0076 (EP,US);
F16K2099/008 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86582 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROVENTIL FÜR EIN ELEKTRONISCH GESTEUERTES GETRIEBE | [2003/13] | English: | MICROVALVE FOR ELECTRONICALLY CONTROLLED TRANSMISSION | [2003/13] | French: | MICROVALVE POUR TRANSMISSION ELECTRONIQUE | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 27.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2004 | BE | 18.08.2004 | CH | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | IT | 18.08.2004 | LI | 18.08.2004 | NL | 18.08.2004 | TR | 18.08.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | SE | 18.11.2004 | ES | 29.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
IT | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
BE | 18.08.2004 | ||
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
CH | 18.08.2004 | ||
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
LI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 18.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4535816 (FEDER MEINRAD [DE], et al) [AD] 1,4,15* column W *; | [A]DE4041579 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 4-14 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0499047 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 32 - line 38; figures 1,2 * [A] 3,4,15-19; | [XA]GB2284026 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 10; figure 1 * [A] 3,4,15-19; | [A]US5913577 (ARNDT ROBIN S [US]) [A] 1,2,4,15 * column A; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6019437 (BARRON RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column A * * column 3, line 18 - column 5, line 27; figures 2-4 * |