EP1395252 - MEDICAMENTS FOR TREATING COLICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bennetts the Chemist (Proprietary) Limited Wendywood Shopping Centre, Daphne Street Wendywood 2148 Sandton / ZA | [2006/37] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Bennetts the Chemist (Proprietary) Limited Wendywood Shopping Centre, Daphne Street Wendywood, 2148 Sandton / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, Basil 12 Blenheim Place Woodburn Road Morningside 2057 Sandton / ZA | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Galgut, John, et al 79 Coleraine Road Blackheath London SE3 7PF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Galgut, John, et al 79 Coleraine Road Blackheath London SE3 7PF / GB | ||
Former [2004/11] | Galgut, John, et al c/o Gouldens, 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 01946749.7 | 22.05.2001 | [2004/11] | WO2001ZA00063 | Priority number, date | ZA20000002508 | 22.05.2000 Original published format: ZA 200002508 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0189506 | Date: | 29.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395252 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1395252 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 29.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/138, A61K31/46, A61K36/81, A61P1/06 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K31/46 (EP,US);
A61K36/73 (EP,US);
A61K36/81 (EP,US);
A61P1/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/138, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/73, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/81, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/11] | A61K31/138, A61K31/46, A61K35/78, A61P1/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Title | German: | METHODEN ZUR KOLIKENBEHANDLUNG | [2004/11] | English: | MEDICAMENTS FOR TREATING COLICS | [2004/11] | French: | MEDICAMENTS DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT DES COLIQUES | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 17.12.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 22.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.02.2003 | M02   Fee paid on   04.03.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2006 | BE | 13.09.2006 | CH | 13.09.2006 | CY | 13.09.2006 | FI | 13.09.2006 | IT | 13.09.2006 | LI | 13.09.2006 | NL | 13.09.2006 | TR | 13.09.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | SE | 13.12.2006 | GR | 14.12.2006 | ES | 24.12.2006 | PT | 26.02.2007 | IE | 22.05.2007 | LU | 22.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
CY | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
IE | 22.05.2007 | ||
LU | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
IE | 22.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
GR | 14.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
IT | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 13.09.2006 | |
BE | 13.09.2006 | ||
CH | 13.09.2006 | ||
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
PT | 26.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
ES | 24.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
NL | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CH | 13.09.2006 | |
FI | 13.09.2006 | ||
LI | 13.09.2006 | ||
SE | 13.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A] - HARDOIN R.A. ET AL., "Colic medication and apparent life-threatening events", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE, (BETHESDA, MD, USA), Database accession no. 91256632, URL: 2044336, XP002970625 | [ ] - CLIN. PEDIATR., PHILA., (199105), vol. 30, no. 5, pages 281 - 285 | [A] - MILENOV K. ET AL., "Interactions between histaminergic and cholinergic pathways of gastric motility regulation", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE, (BETHESDA, MD, USA), Database accession no. 96297104, URL: 8721254, XP002970627 | [ ] - METHODS FIND. EXP. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (199601), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 33 - 39 | [A] - PETKOV V. ET AL., "Comparative studies of colon reactivity of healthy and ionization-radiated guinea-pigs to some spasmogens and their antagonists", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE, (BETHESDA, MD, USA), Database accession no. 79079640, URL: 726912, XP002970628 | [ ] - ACTA PHYSIOL. PHARMACOL. BULG., (1978), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 26 - 37 |