EP1252040 - AUTOMATIC CONTAINER LOCKING APPARATUS FOR TRAILERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KMATL Co., Ltd. 901, Apartment-style Factory 812-1, Hyomun-dong Buk-gu Ulsan-si / KR | [2007/40] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Kummyung Co., Ltd 472-6, Jenae-ri Oedong-eup, Gyeongju-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 780-825 / KR | ||
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Kummyung Precision Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 527, Hyomun-Dong, Buk-gu 638-360 Ulsan-Shi / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Young-Rak 583-19, Pangu-dong Chung-gu Ulsan-shi 681-260 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Sang-Rak 101-1516 Moonhwachongsol Apartment, 317-2 Shinchon-dong Puk-gu Ulsan-shi 683-430 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Se-Jong 103-1114 Pyongy-ongsangil Apartment Namoe-dong Chung-gu Ulsan-shi 681-270 / KR | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2002/44] | Neobard, William John W.H. Beck, Greener & Co., 7 Stone Buildings, Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01946821.4 | 18.01.2001 | [2002/44] | WO2001KR00082 | Priority number, date | KR20000004080 | 27.01.2000 Original published format: KR 2000004080 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0154945 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1252040 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1252040 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/13 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
B60P7/132 (EP,US);
B60P7/13 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE CONTAINERVERRIEGELUNGVORRICHTUNG FÜR ANHÄNGER | [2002/44] | English: | AUTOMATIC CONTAINER LOCKING APPARATUS FOR TRAILERS | [2002/44] | French: | APPAREIL DE VERROUILLAGE AUTOMATIQUE DE CONTENEUR POUR REMORQUES | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2002 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 21.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 28.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 28.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 28.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2005 | 31.01.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2006 | 31.01.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | BE | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | IT | 09.12.2009 | NL | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | IE | 18.01.2010 | LU | 18.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | FR | 09.02.2010 | GB | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | ES | 20.03.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | DE | 03.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 18.01.2010 | ||
LU | 18.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 09.02.2010 | ||
GB | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
DE | 03.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 18.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 09.02.2010 | ||
GB | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
DE | 03.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 18.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 09.02.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
DE | 03.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 18.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 09.02.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
DE | 03.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 09.02.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
DE | 03.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 09.02.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
ES | 20.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3538892 (HIT INT CORP [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5002418 (MCCOWN WILLIAM R E [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS57100542U ; | [A]US4697967 (SCHULZ GERD [DE], et al); | [A]EP0301876 (MULTI STROKE HANDBRAKE CONTROL [GB]); | [A]US5267819 (LYCETT PETER [GB]) |