EP1257547 - 1,3-DISUBSTITUTED PYRROLIDINES AS ALPHA-2-ADRENOCEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2003/11] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
LI
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2003/10] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
LI
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Vienna / AT | |||
Former [2002/47] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
LI
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunnerstrasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEILER, Max, Peter Bockrainweg 16 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | 02 /
NOZULAK, Joachim In der Ziegelei 1 79423 Heitersheim / DE | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Gros, Florent Novartis AG 4002 Basel / CH | [2002/47] | Application number, filing date | 01946858.6 | 26.01.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001EP00861 | Priority number, date | GB20000002100 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: GB 0002100 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0155132 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257547 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257547 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/06, C07D401/06, C07D207/06, C07D405/12, C07D413/06, C07D403/06, A61K31/4025, A61P25/18, A61P25/24 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
C07D207/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D207/09 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/08 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 21.06.2002 | SI | 21.06.2002 | Title | German: | 1,3 - DISUBSTITUIERTE PYRROLIDINE ALS ALPHA -2- ADRENOZEPTORANTAGONISTEN | [2002/47] | English: | 1,3-DISUBSTITUTED PYRROLIDINES AS ALPHA-2-ADRENOCEPTOR ANTAGONISTS | [2002/47] | French: | PYRROLIDINES 1,3-DISUBSTITUEES EN TANT QU'ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR ADRENERGIQUE ALPHA 2 | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Request for further processing for: | 23.02.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.04.2007 | Decision despatched | 19.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | LU | 26.01.2008 | IE | 28.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | [2010/32] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 28.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 28.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
MC | 31.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9218475 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [X] 1,5,7 * example 78; claim 1 * * examples S-18,,S-39; table 1 * [Y] 6,8-10; | [A]US5185364 (DEBERNARDIS JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 1,5-10* example 49 *; | [X]WO0003714 (WATERS ROSS NICHOLAS [SE], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * claim 1 *; | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1965), vol. 62, no. 4, Database accession no. 3995b, XP002164442 [X] 1,3,5,7 * abstract * | [ ] - A.V.EL'TSOV ET AL, "N-Aralkyl derivatives of phenylpyrrolidines", ZH. OBSHCH. KHIM., (1964), vol. 34, no. 10, pages 3344 - 3351 | [AY] - AHN, KYO HAN ET AL, "N-Substituted 3-arylpyrrolidines: potent and selective ligands at the serotonin 1A receptor", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT. (1999), 9(10), 1379-1384, XP004164896 [A] 1 * Examples 3, 8a, 8b, 8c, Table 1 * [Y] 6,8-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00201-2 |