EP1255954 - ACCUMULATOR FOR AN AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halla Climate Control Canada Inc. 300 University Avenue Belleville Ontario K8N 5T6 / CA | [2005/39] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Halla Climate Control Canada Inc. 300 University Avenue Belleville, Ontario K8N 5T6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DICKSON, Timothy, Russell 228 Barleson Avenue Kingston, Ontario K7M 4H1 / CA | 02 /
CRAM, Kenneth, Peter, Luke 106 Avondale Road Belleville, Ontario K8N 4G3 / CA | 03 /
NUSS, Matthew, Bryan 210 Thickson Rd.S. Whitby, Ontario L1N 2E1 / CA | 04 /
RHODES, Steven, Murray 158 Sherman Street Kingston, Ontario K7M 4G8 / CA | 05 /
RYU, Ki-Sun, Jason 68 College Street East, 12 Belleville, Ontario K8P 2E7 / CA | 06 /
STOBBART, Michelle, Marie 73 Benjamin Street Belleville, Ontario K8P 1P8 / CA | [2003/06] |
Former [2002/46] | 01 /
DICKSON, Timothy, Russell 228 Barleson Avenue Kingston, Ontario K7M 4H1 / CA | ||
02 /
CRAM, Kenneth, Peter, Luke 106 Avondale Road Belleville, Ontario K8N 4G3 / CA | |||
03 /
NUSS, Matthew, Bryan 293 Albert Street Belleville, Ontario K8N 3P1 / CA | |||
04 /
RHODES, Steven, Murray 158 Sherman Street Kingston, Ontario K7M 4G8 / CA | |||
05 /
RYU, Ki-Sun, Jason 68 College Street East, 12 Belleville, Ontario K8P 2E7 / CA | |||
06 /
STOBBART, Michelle, Marie 73 Benjamin Street Belleville, Ontario K8P 1P8 / CA | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01946928.7 | 26.01.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001CA00083 | Priority number, date | CA20002297598 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: CA 2297598 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0155652 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255954 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1255954 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F25B43/00 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
F25B43/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/13] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAMMLER FÜR EINE KLIMAANLAGE | [2002/46] | English: | ACCUMULATOR FOR AN AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM | [2002/46] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR DESTINE A UN SYSTEME DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR | [2002/46] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 29.08.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 29.12.2005 | GB | 26.01.2006 | FR | 31.01.2006 | [2009/27] |
Former [2007/11] | DE | 29.12.2005 | |
GB | 26.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | DE | 29.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [E]DE19944950 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [E] 1,6,14,17 * column 5, line 8 - column 47; figure 11 *; | [PX]DE19903833 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4,6,17 * column 3, line 67 - column 5, line 45; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0894651 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 17, line 19 - page 18, line 19; figure 27 *; | [DA]US5471854 (DENOLF STEVEN J [US]) [DA] 1 * column 5, line 6 - line 37 *; | [A]DE2658086 (VOEST AG) | by applicant | US5787729 | US5201792 | US5184479 | US5021792 | US4768355 | US4270934 | US4229949 | US5179844 | US5471854 | US4474035 | US411005 | US5184480 | US5660058 | US4627247 |