EP1301540 - RGD (ARG-GLY-ASP) COUPLED TO NEUROPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioSynthema Inc. 379 Woodmere Nook Ct. St Charles Missouri 63303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/36] | For all designated states BioSynthema Inc. 379 Woodmere Nook Ct. St Charles, Missouri 63303 / US | ||
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT, INC. P.O. Box 5840 675 McDonnell Blvd. St. Louis, MO 63134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE JONG, Marion Eleonorastraat 119 NL-3135 PA Vlaardingen / NL | 02 /
KRENNING, Eric, Paul Hoflaan 71 NL-3062 JC Rotterdam / NL | 03 /
VAN HAGEN, Petrus, Martinus Goosse van der Windstraat 14 NL-3032 XM Rotterdam / NL | [2003/16] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 01947245.5 | 26.04.2001 | [2003/16] | WO2001EP04764 | Priority number, date | EP20000201499 | 26.04.2000 Original published format: EP 00201499 | [2003/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0181426 | Date: | 01.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1301540 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1301540 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K19/00 | [2003/16] | CPC: |
C07K5/1019 (EP,US);
A61K47/62 (EP,US);
A61K51/082 (EP,US);
A61K51/083 (EP,US);
A61K51/088 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/575 (EP,US);
C07K14/57563 (EP,US);
C07K14/595 (EP,US);
C07K14/655 (EP,US);
C07K14/6555 (EP,US);
C07K14/75 (EP,US);
C07K14/78 (EP,US);
C07K19/00 (EP,US);
C07K5/0817 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AN NEUROPEPTIDE GEBUNDENES RGD (ARG-GLY-ASP) | [2003/16] | English: | RGD (ARG-GLY-ASP) COUPLED TO NEUROPEPTIDES | [2003/16] | French: | RGD (ARG-GLY-ASP) COUPLE A DES NEUROPEPTIDES | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/16] | RGD (ARG-GLY-ASP) COUPLE A DES (NEURO)PEPTIDES | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 15.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04101401.0 / EP1452543 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2004 | FI | 28.07.2004 | IT | 28.07.2004 | TR | 28.07.2004 | DK | 28.10.2004 | GR | 28.10.2004 | SE | 28.10.2004 | PT | 28.12.2004 | CY | 26.04.2005 | IE | 26.04.2005 | LU | 26.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
IT | 28.07.2004 | ||
TR | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
CY | 26.04.2005 | ||
IE | 26.04.2005 | ||
LU | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
TR | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
CY | 26.04.2005 | ||
IE | 26.04.2005 | ||
LU | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
TR | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
CY | 26.04.2005 | ||
IE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
TR | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
IE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
IE | 26.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
DK | 28.10.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.10.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 28.07.2004 | |
FI | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 28.07.2004 | |
SE | 28.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 28.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0385659 (UNIV FUJITA HEALTH [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * See page 2 (esp. lines 29-44) - page 3, (line 29) *; | [Y] - VELLA ET AL, "Grafting an RGD motif onto an epidermal growth factor-like module: Chemical synthesis and functional characterization of the chimeric molecule", JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE RESEARCH, MUNKSGAARD INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHERS, COPENHAGEN, DK, (199911), vol. 54, no. 5, ISSN 1397-002X, pages 415 - 426, XP000851981 [Y] 1 * See page 416, second column * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1399-3011.1999.00137.x | [Y] - DE JONG ET AL, "Therapy of neuroendocrine tumors with radiolabeled somatostatin-analogues", QUARTERLY JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, MILAN, IT, (199912), vol. 43, no. 4, ISSN 1125-0135, pages 356 - 366, XP000978316 [Y] 1 * See page 356 (Abstract) and 357 (Figure 1) * |