EP1300362 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING HYDROGEN FLUORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2007/35] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Hironobu Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND. LTD 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 02 /
TAKEUCHI, Toshinobu 23-201, 2, Wakayamadai 2-chome Shimamoto-cho, Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-00 / JP | 03 /
HOMOTO, Yukio Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND. LTD 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 04 /
EMA, Norio Yodogawa Works DAIKIN IND. LTD 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01947871.8 | 06.07.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001JP05868 | Priority number, date | JP20000208172 | 10.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000208172 | [2003/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0204348 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1300362 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1300362 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/02, B01J7/00, C01B7/19, C22C29/02, C22C32/00 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
B01J19/006 (EP,US);
B01F27/051 (EP,US);
B01F27/053 (EP,US);
B01F27/091 (EP,US);
B01F35/511 (EP,US);
B01J19/0066 (EP,US);
B01J19/02 (EP,US);
B01J19/18 (EP,US);
B01J19/20 (EP,US);
C01B17/96 (EP,US);
C01B7/191 (EP,US);
C01B7/192 (EP,US);
C01F11/46 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0004 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00247 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, C22C32/0052, C22C29/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/15] | C01B7/19, B01J7/00, B01J19/00, C22C29/02, C22C32/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON FLUORWASSERSTOFF | [2003/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING HYDROGEN FLUORIDE | [2003/15] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LA PRODUCTION DE FLUORURE D'HYDROGENE | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2003 | Translation filed | 09.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH08199284 ; | [Y]JPS5939703 ; | [Y]JPS5939703 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4491571 (SUZUKI KAICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 46 * * column 4, lines 36-48 *; | [A]US5305840 (LIANG DAH-BEN [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [Y]JPH08199284 (HITACHI TOOL) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0759480 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * page 1, line 5 - page 1, line 10 * * page 3, line 20 - page 12, line 37 *; | [Y]US5918103 (KOBAYASHI MASAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 1, line 12 - column 1, line 24 * * examples 1-7 *; | [Y]US5993506 (KOBAYASHI MASAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 1, line 12 - column 1, line 32 * * column 2, line 18 - column 2, line 37; example 17 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08199284 A 19960806 (HITACHI TOOL ENG LTD) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840613), vol. 008, no. 126, Database accession no. (C - 228), & JP59039703 A 19840305 (ASAHI GLASS KK) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS5759626 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPS5939703 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH01119639 (NIPPON TUNGSTEN); | [Y]JPH0440282B ; | [Y]JPH08199284 (HITACHI TOOL); | [Y]JP2000001733 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP, et al) |