EP1306208 - RESIN LAMINATE, LEATHER-LIKE SHEET, AUTOMOTIVE INTERIOR MATERIAL, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RESIN LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Technofine Co. Ltd 6-1, Yokoami 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0015 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Idemitsu Technofine Co. Ltd 6-1, Yokoami 1-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 130-0015 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA, Hidetoshi c/o Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd 1660, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0205 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Tomomasa 6-1, Yokoami 1-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 130-0015 / JP | [2003/29] |
Former [2003/18] | 01 /
SHIMADA, Hidetoshi 1660, Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0205 / JP | ||
02 /
SUZUKI, Tomomasa 6-1, Yokoami 1-chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 130-0015 / JP | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M. Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01947896.5 | 06.07.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001JP05897 | Priority number, date | JP20000208657 | 10.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000208657 | JP20000208658 | 10.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000208658 | JP20000208659 | 10.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000208659 | JP20000308106 | 06.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000308106 | JP20000338140 | 06.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000338140 | JP20000361190 | 28.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000361190 | [2003/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0204204 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1306208 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B32B25/08 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (KR);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08J2323/02 (EP,US);
C08J2475/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31547 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFLAMINAT, LEDERERSATZSCHICHT, AUTOINNENVERKLEIDUNGSMATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DAS KUNSTSTOFFLAMINAT | [2003/18] | English: | RESIN LAMINATE, LEATHER-LIKE SHEET, AUTOMOTIVE INTERIOR MATERIAL, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RESIN LAMINATE | [2003/18] | French: | STRATIFIE EN RESINE, FEUILLE RAPPELANT LE CUIR, MATERIAU D'INTERIEUR AUTOMOBILE, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE STRATIFIE EN RESINE | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2003 | Translation filed | 05.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 28.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6128533 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD, et al); | [X]EP0336780 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) |