EP1300789 - COMMODITY SELLING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA, Kenshu, c/o SONY MARKETING (JAPAN) INC. 10-18, Takanawa 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0074 / JP | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, Dr. D. Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01947905.4 | 06.07.2001 | [2003/15] | WO2001JP05912 | Priority number, date | JP20000207567 | 07.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000207567 | JP20000207568 | 07.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000207568 | [2003/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0205162 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1300789 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.01.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q10/0637 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0635 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APPARAT ZUM WARENVERKAUF | [2003/15] | English: | COMMODITY SELLING APPARATUS | [2003/15] | French: | SYSTEME DE VENTE DE MARCHANDISES | [2003/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2002 | Translation filed | 20.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2002 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2002 | Examination requested [2003/15] | 10.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9909508 (IMAGING TECH PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-55 * abstract *; | [X]EP0902381 (AMAZON COM INC [US]) [X] 1-55 * abstract *; | [X]US6058373 (BLINN ARNOLD [US], et al) [X] 1-55* abstract *; | [X]GB2343972 (DELL USA LP [US]) [X] 1-55 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH1196240 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH11353391 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2000029961 (NEC CORP); | [X]JP2000099577 (DELL USA LP); | [Y] - SHIGEKI OOYAMA ET AL., "Supply chain kakumei; Kokyaku manzoku-de koujou no kettei-da; Shin no rieki wo umu kyuukyoku no jouhou senryaku", NIKKEI JOHO STRATEGY, NIKKEI BP K.K., (19980724), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 8 - 15, XP002947240 |