EP1315521 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE EFFICACY OF ARTIFICIAL INSEMINATION OF NON-HUMAN ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001-0199 / US | [2003/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMITTE, Eric, J. 02 Rue Pasteur F-53700 Villaines-la-Juhel / FR | 02 /
BRADFORD James, R. 6179 Countrywood Ct. Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01948234.8 | 03.07.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001US16514 | Priority number, date | US20000217054P | 10.07.2000 Original published format: US 217054 P | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0204006 | Date: | 17.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1315521 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K35/52 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
A61K35/52 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/52, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | 16.01.2003 | LT | 16.01.2003 | LV | 16.01.2003 | MK | 16.01.2003 | RO | 16.01.2003 | SI | 16.01.2003 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER EFFIZIENZ DER KÜNSTLICHEN BESAMUNG VON TIEREN | [2003/23] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE EFFICACY OF ARTIFICIAL INSEMINATION OF NON-HUMAN ANIMALS | [2003/23] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT UNE MEILLEURE GESTION DES GESTATIONS, ET COMPOSITION ASSOCIEE | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 03.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/52] | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6071689 (SEIDEL GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * examples 2,4 *; | [PA]WO0195815 (XY INC [US], et al) [PA] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - PENA F J ET AL, "Intrauterine infusion of PGF2alpha at insemination enhances reproductive performance of sows during the low fertility season.", VETERINARY JOURNAL, (200005), vol. 159, no. 3, ISSN 1090-0233, pages 259 - 261, XP008008842 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/tvjl.1999.0428 | [X] - WOODS J ET AL, "Effect of intrauterine treatment with prostaglandin E2 prior to insemination of mares in the uterine horn or body.", THERIOGENOLOGY, (200006), vol. 53, no. 9, ISSN 0093-691X, pages 1827 - 1836, XP002215055 [X] 1,2,4-7 * page 1829, paragraph 5 - page 1832 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0093-691X(00)00318-6 | [X] - PENA F J ET AL, "Effect of vulvomucosal injection of PGF2alpha at insemination on subsequent fertility and litter size in pigs under field conditions.", ANIMAL REPRODUCTION SCIENCE, (19980630), vol. 52, no. 1, ISSN 0378-4320, pages 63 - 69, XP002215056 [X] 1-7 * page 66; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4320(98)00083-9 | [Y] - BADER H ET AL, "[Effect of the administration of PGF2 alpha synchronously with insemination on the pregnancy rate in mares in an insemination program]", MEDLINE, (199902), Database accession no. NLM10077816, XP002215058 [Y] 9-11 * abstract * | [ ] - TIERARZTLICHE PRAXIS. AUSGABE G, GROSSTIERE/NUTZTIERE. GERMANY FEB 1999, (199902), vol. 27, no. 1, ISSN 1434-1220, pages 54 - 60 | [Y] - KOZUMPLÍK J ET AL, "[The effect of Oestrophan Spofa (synthetic analog of prostaglandin F2 alpha) added to the insemination dose on pregnancy and fertility in sows]", VETERINARNI MEDICINA. CZECHOSLOVAKIA APR 1986, (198604), vol. 31, no. 4, ISSN 0375-8427, pages 227 - 232, XP008008820 [Y] 9-11 *abstract* |