20.08.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
30.07.2010 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.06.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
27.04.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.11.2009 |
First examination report |
|
10.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.10.2009 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] |
07.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
08.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2004 |
Deletion: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2003 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] |
07.02.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
07.02.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
28.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
28.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|