EP1294293 - INTEGRATED HERD MANAGEMENT SYSTEM UTILIZING ISOLATED POPULATIONS OF X-CHROMOSOME BEARING AND Y-CHROMOSOME BEARING SPERMATOZOA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states XY, LLC 22575 State Highway 6 South Navasota, TX 77868 / US | [2010/30] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states XY, Inc. 1108 North Lemay Avenue Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states XY, Inc. 1108 North Lemay Avenue Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | ||
For all designated states Colorado State University Through its agent Colorado State University Research Foundation; Room 410, 601 South Howes Street Fort Collins, CO 80522 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITTIER, Jack, C. 4880 East County Road 64 Wellington, CO 80549 / US | 02 /
RIGGS, Barbi, A. 299 Big Valley Outlook, MT 59252 / US | 03 /
BURNS, Patrick, D. 519, Wabash St Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US | 04 /
SEIDEL, George 3101 Arrowhead Road LaPorte, CO 80535 / US | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/13] | 01 /
WHITTIER, Jack, C. 4880 East County Road 64 Wellington, CO 80549 / US | ||
02 /
RIGGS, Barbi, A. 299 Big Valley Outlook, MT 59252 / US | |||
03 /
BURNS, Patrick, D. 931, Kingston Drive Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | |||
04 /
SEIDEL, George 3101 Arrowhead Road LaPorte, CO 80535 / US | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01948330.4 | 12.06.2001 | [2003/13] | WO2001US18879 | Priority number, date | US20000211093P | 12.06.2000 Original published format: US 211093 P | US20000224050P | 09.08.2000 Original published format: US 224050 P | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0195815 | Date: | 20.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1294293 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.12.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/43, A61D7/00 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
A01K67/027 (EP,US);
A61B17/43 (EP,US);
A61K35/52 (EP,US);
C12N15/873 (EP,US);
C12N5/0612 (EP,US);
G01N15/149 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/13] | Extension states | AL | 10.01.2003 | LT | 10.01.2003 | LV | 10.01.2003 | MK | 10.01.2003 | RO | 10.01.2003 | SI | 10.01.2003 | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES HERDENMANAGEMENTSYSTEM UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ISOLIERTEN POPULATIONEN VON X- UND Y-CHROMOSOMEN-TRAGENDEN SPERMATOZOEN | [2003/13] | English: | INTEGRATED HERD MANAGEMENT SYSTEM UTILIZING ISOLATED POPULATIONS OF X-CHROMOSOME BEARING AND Y-CHROMOSOME BEARING SPERMATOZOA | [2003/13] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONDUITE DE TROUPEAU INTEGRE UTILISANT DES POPULATIONS ISOLEES DE SPERMATOZOIDES PORTEURS DU CHROMOSOME X ET DU CHROMOSOME Y | [2003/13] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 13.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 04.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [X]US4327177 (SHRIMPTON WALLACE); | [YP]US6087352 (TROUT WILLIAM E [US]) |