EP1255477 - INDICATOR FOR LIQUID HEATING APPLIANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTTER CONTROLS LIMITED Hardwick Square South Buxton Derbyshire SK17 6LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states OTTER CONTROLS LIMITED Hardwick Square South Buxton, Derbyshire SK17 6LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'NEILL, Robert Andrew "Morcot", Alexandra Road Buxton, Derbyshire SK17 9NQ / GB | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Milhench, Howard Leslie R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Milhench, Howard Leslie R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01948928.5 | 31.01.2001 | [2002/46] | WO2001GB00392 | Priority number, date | GB20000002488 | 03.02.2000 Original published format: GB 0002488 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0156438 | Date: | 09.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255477 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1255477 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/212 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
A47J27/212 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/03] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FUR WASSERERHITZUNGSGERATE | [2002/46] | English: | INDICATOR FOR LIQUID HEATING APPLIANCES | [2002/46] | French: | INDICATEUR POUR APPAREILS DE CHAUFFAGE DE LIQUIDES | [2002/46] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 14.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2004 | BE | 14.01.2004 | CH | 14.01.2004 | CY | 14.01.2004 | ES | 14.01.2004 | FI | 14.01.2004 | IT | 14.01.2004 | LI | 14.01.2004 | NL | 14.01.2004 | TR | 14.01.2004 | LU | 31.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | IE | 02.02.2004 | DK | 14.04.2004 | GR | 14.04.2004 | SE | 14.04.2004 | PT | 14.06.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
CY | 14.01.2004 | ||
ES | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
IT | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
TR | 14.01.2004 | ||
LU | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
CY | 14.01.2004 | ||
ES | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
TR | 14.01.2004 | ||
LU | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
TR | 14.01.2004 | ||
LU | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
LU | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LU | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
SE | 14.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [YA]GB2185161 (OTTER CONTROLS LTD) [Y] 4 * page 3, line 70 - page 5, line 127; figure - *[A] 1-3; | [X]DE3904859 (KRUPS STIFTUNG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 59; figure 3 *; | [A]DE19652829 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [XY]GB2332522 (OTTER CONTROLS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 2; figure - * [Y] 4,6,7; | [YA]WO9948331 (STRIX LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 6,7 * page 12, line 24 - page 17, line 8; figures 1-7 * [A] 5 | by applicant | GB2228634 |