EP1257388 - A HOLDER FOR RECEIVING AND RETAINING TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raaco International A/S P.O. Box 176 4800 Nykoebing Falster / DK | [2002/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEIS, Anders Bjergvej 8 DK-4840 Norre Alslev / DK | 02 /
HERMANSEN, Tore Norre Boulevard 17 DK-4800 Nykobing Falster / DK | [2007/02] |
Former [2002/47] | 01 /
KEIS, Anders Bjergvej 8 DK-4840 N rre Alslev / DK | ||
02 /
HERMANSEN, Tore N rre Boulevard 17 DK-4800 Nyk bing Falster / DK | Representative(s) | Thierry-Carstensen, Ole Jean, et al C/o Chas. Hude H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Thierry-Carstensen, Ole Jean, et al c/o Chas. Hude H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 01948957.4 | 31.01.2001 | [2002/47] | WO2001DK00068 | Priority number, date | DK20000000162 | 01.02.2000 Original published format: DK 200000162 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0156751 | Date: | 09.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257388 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257388 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B25H3/04, A47G29/00 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
B25H3/003 (EP,US);
A47J47/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME UND ZUM HALTEN VON WERKZEUGEN | [2006/51] | English: | A HOLDER FOR RECEIVING AND RETAINING TOOLS | [2002/47] | French: | SUPPORT DE RECEPTION ET DE RETENTION D'OUTILS | [2006/51] |
Former [2002/47] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUFNAHME UND ZUM HALTEN VON WERZEUGEN | ||
Former [2002/47] | SUPPORT DE R CEPTION ET DE R TENTION D'OUTILS | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.05.2007 | BE | 16.05.2007 | CH | 16.05.2007 | CY | 16.05.2007 | DK | 16.05.2007 | FI | 16.05.2007 | IT | 16.05.2007 | LI | 16.05.2007 | TR | 16.05.2007 | GR | 17.08.2007 | PT | 16.10.2007 | IE | 31.01.2008 | LU | 31.01.2008 | MC | 31.01.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
CY | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IT | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2008 | ||
LU | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
CY | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IT | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IT | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IT | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IT | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 16.05.2007 | |
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB987641 (CARGO AIDS LTD); | [A]DE2531790 (SCHREIBERPLASTIK HEINZ SCHREIB); | [Y]GB2038613 (GREEN M G, et al); | [A]DE3004132 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]); | [A]SE453734 (BERGSTROM KJELL) |