EP1409815 - SIDE COVERING FOR A COLLAPSIBLE TENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PATEA GmbH Dammstrasse 19 6300 Zug / CH | [2006/46] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Stoeckler, Heinz Frohwiesstrasse 37 8630 Rüti / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinz Stöckler Frohwiesstrasse 37 8630 Rüti / CH | [2007/14] |
Former [2004/17] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich) Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 2792 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2004/17] | Patentanwälte Feldmann & Partner AG Postfach Europastrasse 17 8152 Glattbrugg / CH | Application number, filing date | 01949178.6 | 23.07.2001 | [2004/17] | WO2001CH00455 | Priority number, date | CH20000001479 | 26.07.2000 Original published format: CH 147900 | [2004/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0208549 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1409815 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1409815 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04H15/64, E04H15/46 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
E04H15/46 (EP,US);
E04H15/644 (EP,US);
Y10T403/61 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/17] | Title | German: | SEITENVERKLEIDUNG AN EINEM ZUSAMMENKLAPPBAREN ZELT | [2004/17] | English: | SIDE COVERING FOR A COLLAPSIBLE TENT | [2004/17] | French: | REVETEMENT LATERAL APPLIQUE SUR UNE TENTE REPLIABLE | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 15.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.09.2007 | DK | 19.09.2007 | FI | 19.09.2007 | IE | 19.09.2007 | TR | 19.09.2007 | GR | 20.12.2007 | PT | 19.02.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 19.09.2007 | |
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/45] | DK | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
IE | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 19.09.2007 | |
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 19.09.2007 | |
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 19.09.2007 | |
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 19.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3255769 (LLOYD MARSHALL O) [A] 1 * column 2, line 28 - line 39 * * column 6, line 30 - line 45; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4867314 (CLEMENTS HAROLD J [GB]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 53 - line 59; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0470024 (LUCIEN WALTER SOCIETE ANONYME [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | CH98697 | EP0514574 |