Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4690627B | Global Dossier | 01.06.2011 | B2 | JP2004517035 | 10.06.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0105676 | 17.05.2001 | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7052701 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0105676 | 17.05.2001 | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1284948 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2006 | B1 | EP1284948 | 26.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0105676 | 17.05.2001 | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50110706D1 | 21.09.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP0105676 | 17.05.2001 | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 | DE50110706 | 17.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6765119 | 20.07.2004 | B2 | US2003114720 | 19.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0105676 | 17.05.2001 | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0187809 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100752442B | Global Dossier | 27.08.2007 | B1 | KR20040007219 | 24.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE335715T | 15.09.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1223563C | 19.10.2005 | C | CN1450984 | 22.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10024542 | 22.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2269426T | 01.04.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY127613 | 29.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10024542 | 18.05.2000 |