EP1284948 - METHOD OF PRODUCING SATURATED C 3-C 20 ALCOHOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMANN, Herwig Knietschstrasse 21 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
RÖPER, Michael Pegauer Strasse 10 67157 Wachenheim / DE | 03 /
BLANKERTZ, Heinrich-Josef Im Elster 18 67147 Forst / DE | 04 /
STROHMEYER, Max Woogstrasse 41 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 05 /
WALZ, Helmut Osloer Weg 18 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
ZINKE-ALLMANG, Helmut Mittelberg 4 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patent Attorneys, Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner, Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01949347.7 | 17.05.2001 | [2003/09] | WO2001EP05676 | Priority number, date | DE2000124542 | 18.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10024542 | [2003/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0187809 | Date: | 22.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1284948 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284948 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/141, C07C31/02 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
C07C29/141 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/141, C07C31/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GESÄTTIGTEN C 3-C 20-ALKOHOLEN | [2003/09] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING SATURATED C 3-C 20 ALCOHOLS | [2003/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ALCOOLS C 3-C 20 SATURES | [2003/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/09] | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.08.2006 | IE | 09.08.2006 | TR | 09.08.2006 | DK | 09.11.2006 | GR | 10.11.2006 | PT | 09.01.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 09.08.2006 | |
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | IE | 09.08.2006 | |
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | IE | 09.08.2006 | |
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | IE | 09.08.2006 | |
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | IE | 09.08.2006 | |
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | IE | 09.08.2006 | |
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | DK | 09.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0004122 (STAMICARBON [NL]) [Y] 1-6 * example -; claim - *; | [XY]GB2097390 (HYDROCARBON RESEARCH INC) [X] 1-6 * example -; claim - * [Y] 1-6; | [X]WO9931035 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 1 - line 10 ** page 6, line 44 - page 7, line 4; example -; claim - * |