EP1289492 - COSMETIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING HUMAN SERUM ALBUMIN OBTAINED FROM TRANSGENIC NON-HUMAN ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Change - refusal | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Pfingstweide 53 61159 Friedberg / DE | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICHNER, Wolfram An der Landwehr 30 35510 Butzbach / DE | 02 /
SOMMERMEYER, Klaus In der Laubach 26 61191 Rosbach / DE | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/11] | 01 /
EICHNER, Wolfram Richard Wagner Strasse 12 35510 Butzbach / DE | ||
02 /
SOMMERMEYER, Klaus In der Laubach 26 61191 Rosbach / DE | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01949362.6 | 28.05.2001 | [2003/11] | WO2001EP06058 | Priority number, date | DE2000126998 | 31.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10026998 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0191713 | Date: | 06.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1289492 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K38/38 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K38/38 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND MENSCHLICHES SERUM ALBUMIN VON TRANSGENISCHEN TIEREN | [2003/11] | English: | COSMETIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING HUMAN SERUM ALBUMIN OBTAINED FROM TRANSGENIC NON-HUMAN ANIMALS | [2003/11] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE COMPRENANT DE L'ALBUMINE DE SERUM HUMAIN OBTENUE A PARTIR D'ANIMAUX NON HUMAINS TRANSGENIQUES | [2003/11] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 30.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.02.2007 | 11.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/25] | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/07] | 10.02.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 22.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.07.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/07] | Appeal following examination | 18.06.2007 | Appeal received No. T1082/07 | 18.06.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.07.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0177409 (LAUMOND GERARD DR [FR]) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0180968 (EXOVIR INC [US]) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9602573 (GENE PHARMING EUROP BV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9804718 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |